Hines v. Warden
Petitioner: Adrian Hines
Respondent: Warden
Not Classified By Court: INDIANA STATE PRISON E-FILE (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 3:2020cv00697
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. Magistrate Consent forms due by 11/3/2020. (slm)
October 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David E Corey on behalf of Warden (Corey, David)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Pursuant to Section 2254 Habeas Corpus Rule 5, the respondent is ORDERED to enter an appearance by 10/9/2020, and to file a response to the petition with the entire administrative record by 11/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 9/25/2020. (Copy mailed as directed in Order)(mrm)
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 3025436 (jld)
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 Consent to Receipt of Documents Through Prisoner Electronic Filing Program by Adrian Hines. Pursuant to General Order 2018-1, documents submitted to the court for filing will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing that will constitute official service upon registered users of CM/ECF. If any parties to the case are not registered CM/ECF users, the Clerk of the Court will mail the document via U.S. Postal Service on behalf of the inmate. NOTE: The E-Filing Program does not affect the obligation of other parties to serve copies of documents in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (rmc)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Adrian Hines. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(No filing fee or IFP received)(File stamped copy with case number sent to Hines)(kms) Modified on 8/19/2020 to add docket text (kms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hines v. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Represented By: David E Corey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Adrian Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: INDIANA STATE PRISON E-FILE (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?