Cavalier Transportation Services Inc v. Aguirre et al
Plaintiff: CAVALIER TRANSPORTATION SERVICES, INC. and Cavalier Transportation Services Inc
Defendant: ROSAS TRANSPORTS, LLC, DENIS AGUIRRE and Rosas Transports LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00703
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 13 Amended ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by Denis Aguirre, Rosas Transports LLC.(Vetne, J)
October 13, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by Denis Aguirre, Rosas Transports LLC.(Vetne, J)
October 13, 2020 Filing 11 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (slm)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Joint Proposed Discovery due by 10/28/2020. Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/3/2020 10:30 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr.. Dial in instructions to be provided to the parties listed on the docket by email unless the court is notified that specified attorneys need not be contacted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 10/13/20. (slm)
October 5, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Cavalier Transportation Services Inc.(Whitten, Christopher)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Plaintiff is ORDERED to file an amended complaint by 10/5/2020, properly alleging the citizenship of each party. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 9/21/2020. (mrm)
September 18, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Denis Aguirre, Rosas Transports LLC.(Vetne, J)
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by J Thomas Vetne on behalf of All Defendants (Vetne, J)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cavalier Transportation Services Inc. Denis Aguirre served on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020; Rosas Transports LLC served on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Whitten, Christopher)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Denis Aguirre, Rosas Transports LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (rmc)
August 20, 2020 Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (NEW CASE) (rmc)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew K Phillips on behalf of CAVALIER TRANSPORTATION SERVICES, INC. (Phillips, Matthew)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R Whitten on behalf of CAVALIER TRANSPORTATION SERVICES, INC. (Whitten, Christopher)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against DENIS AGUIRRE, ROSAS TRANSPORTS, LLC( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4316923.), filed by CAVALIER TRANSPORTATION SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Whitten, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cavalier Transportation Services Inc v. Aguirre et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROSAS TRANSPORTS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENIS AGUIRRE
Represented By: J Thomas Vetne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosas Transports LLC
Represented By: J Thomas Vetne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAVALIER TRANSPORTATION SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Matthew K Phillips
Represented By: Christopher R Whitten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cavalier Transportation Services Inc
Represented By: Matthew K Phillips
Represented By: Christopher R Whitten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?