Hynek v. Futch et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Hynek
Defendant: James Futch and J&J Driveaway Systems, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00704
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED DOCUMENT by J&J Driveaway Systems, LLC. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, . (Ehrhardt, Thomas)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Defendants are ORDERED to file an amended notice of removal, by 9/25/2020, that properly alleges the citizenship of each party to this action as outlined in Order. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 9/10/2020. (mrm)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by James Futch, J&J Driveaway Systems, LLC.(Ehrhardt, Thomas)
August 19, 2020 Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (NEW CASE) (bas)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles F Albrecht on behalf of All Defendants (Albrecht, Charles)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas S Ehrhardt on behalf of All Defendants (Ehrhardt, Thomas)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4316932.) from LaPorte Superior Court, Cause No. 46D02-2007-CT-000999, filed by J&J Driveaway Systems, LLC, James Futch. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Ehrhardt, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hynek v. Futch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Hynek
Represented By: Matthew B Dogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Futch
Represented By: Charles F Albrecht
Represented By: Thomas S Ehrhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J&J Driveaway Systems, LLC
Represented By: Charles F Albrecht
Represented By: Thomas S Ehrhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?