Spoor v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Deborah Spoor
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Not Classified By Court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 3:2020cv00729
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: In light of the notice filed by the plaintiff, the Court EXTENDS the deadline to pay the filing fee to 11/2/2020. The Court again cautions the plaintiff, though, that the case may be dismissed if there is no response by that deadline. Text only entry by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 10/8/2020. (jss)
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Deborah Spoor re #3 Order,, Set Deadlines,, Terminate Motions, re: the Court's Order directing the payment of a filing fee (Olinsky, Howard)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DENYING #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Deborah Spoor. The Court GRANTS the plaintiff until October 2, 2020, to pay the $400.00 filing fee; and CAUTIONS the plaintiff that if there is no response by the deadline, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 9/1/20. (ksp)
August 31, 2020 Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (kjp)
August 31, 2020 Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio added. NEW CASE, MOTION PENDING. (kjp)
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Deborah Spoor. (Olinsky, Howard)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Deborah Spoor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 USM-285 Form, #6 USM-285 Form, #7 USM-285 Form)(Olinsky, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spoor v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Spoor
Represented By: Howard D Olinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?