Gutierrez v. Thor Motor Coach, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00782
Filed: September 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Office: South Bend Office
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 5:20-cv-04189. Original file and docket sheet received.
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #10 Motion to Transfer Case. The Clerk of the Court shall transfer the case file to the Northern District of Indiana, South Bend Division. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/16/2020.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to Indiana Federal Court filed by Thor Motor Coach, Inc.. Responses due by 9/25/2020. Replies due by 10/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gonzales, Dolores) (Filed on 9/11/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/16/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Gregorio Gutierrez.. (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 8/3/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/16/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S SECOND OTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 8/14/2020. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/16/2020.]
July 10, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/24/2020. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/16/2020.]
July 2, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Thor Motor Coach, Inc... (Gonzales, Dolores) (Filed on 7/2/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/16/2020.]
July 2, 2020 Filing 5 Thor Motor Coach's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) byThor Motor Coach, Inc.. (Gonzales, Dolores) (Filed on 7/2/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/16/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/22/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/29/2020 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/16/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/10/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/16/2020.]
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Thor Motor Coach, Inc. (Gonzales, Dolores) (Filed on 6/25/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/16/2020.]
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara Superior Court. Their case number is 20CV366311. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14621852). Filed byThor Motor Coach, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Plaintiff's State Court Action Complaint, #2 Exhibit B: Civil Lawsuit Notice (Santa Clara), #3 Exhibit C: Summons-POS (TMC), #4 Exhibit D: Retail Installment Sales Contract, #5 Exhibit E: Notice of Removal to State Court, #6 Exhibit F: Notice of Removal to Plaintiff, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gonzales, Dolores) (Filed on 6/25/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/16/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gutierrez v. Thor Motor Coach, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?