Saheb Khan et al v. Jayco, Inc.
Plaintiff: Madalyn I. Saheb Khan and Khalid Saheb Khan
Defendant: Jayco Inc and Ford Motor Company
Not Classified By Court: Hon. Michael P Scopelitis
Case Number: 3:2020cv00954
Filed: November 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2021 Filing 25 DISCLOSURE of Expert filed by Ford Motor Company.(Wood, Jeremiah)
March 19, 2021 Filing 24 ANSWER to #20 Amended Complaint by Ford Motor Company.(Wood, Jeremiah)
March 19, 2021 Set Answer Deadline: Ford Motor Company Answer due 3/23/2021. (kms)
March 18, 2021 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service (Ford) served on Ford on 3/2/2021, filed by Khalid Saheb Khan, Madalyn I. Saheb Khan. (Douglass, Sara)
March 4, 2021 Filing 22 ANSWER to #20 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Jayco Inc.(Gasper, Trevor)
February 18, 2021 Filing 21 Summons Issued as to Ford Motor Company. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (nae)
February 17, 2021 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against All Defendants, filed by Madalyn I. Saheb Khan, Khalid Saheb Khan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Summons to Ford)(Douglass, Sara)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: This Court now ADOPTS the parties discovery plan and establishes the following deadlines: Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 3/1/2021. Any amendments to the pleadings to be filed by 3/1/2021. Plaintiff expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the defendant by 7/30/2021, Defendant expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the plaintiff by 8/31/2021. Supplementation under Rule 26(e) due every six weeks until trial. The last date for the completion of ALL DISCOVERY is 2/4/2022. The last date to file any discovery-related nondispositive motion shall be 30 days prior to the discovery deadline. The parties have agreed upon the Honorable Michael Scopelitis as mediator. Mediation to be completed by 9/30/2021. The Court hereby VACATES the Rule 16(b) Preliminary Pretrial conference scheduled for January 14, 2021 at 10:45 A.M. (EST). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 1/7/2021. (lhc)
December 23, 2020 Filing 18 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Gasper, Trevor)
December 10, 2020 Filing 17 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (slm)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Joint Proposed Discovery due by 1/4/2021. Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/14/2021 10:45 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 12/10/20. (slm)
November 18, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Jayco Inc.(Gasper, Trevor)
November 18, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett R Hummer on behalf of Jayco Inc (Hummer, Brett)
November 12, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin V Bolden on behalf of Jayco Inc (Bolden, Erin)
November 12, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor Q Gasper on behalf of Jayco Inc (Gasper, Trevor)
November 12, 2020 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Oregon; Case Number 2:20-cv-01741. Original file and docket sheet received.
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 OPINION AND ORDER: Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue #6 , is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Indiana, South Bend Division. All other pending motions are DENIED as moot. After transfer has been effectuated, the Clerk shall CLOSE this case. Signed on 11/6/2020 by Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (dsg) [Transferred from Oregon on 11/12/2020.]
October 30, 2020 Filing 8 Declaration of Helaina L. Chinn . Filed by Jayco, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion to change/transfer venue #6 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Chinn, Helaina) [Transferred from Oregon on 11/12/2020.]
October 30, 2020 Filing 7 Declaration of Phil Houser . Filed by Jayco, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion to change/transfer venue #6 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Chinn, Helaina) [Transferred from Oregon on 11/12/2020.]
October 30, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed Motion to Change or Transfer Venue . Filed by Jayco, Inc.. (Chinn, Helaina) [Transferred from Oregon on 11/12/2020.]
October 14, 2020 Filing 5 Declaration of Helaina L. Chinn . Filed by Jayco, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition #4 .) (Chinn, Helaina) [Transferred from Oregon on 11/12/2020.]
October 14, 2020 Filing 4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Jayco, Inc.. (Chinn, Helaina) [Transferred from Oregon on 11/12/2020.]
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 2/5/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/8/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 3/8/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (ecp) [Transferred from Oregon on 11/12/2020.]
October 8, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Jayco, Inc.. (Smith, Vicki) [Transferred from Oregon on 11/12/2020.]
October 8, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 20CV30927 from Malheur County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7336874 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Jayco, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Smith, Vicki) [Transferred from Oregon on 11/12/2020.]
September 10, 2020 Filing 11 STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Jayco Inc, filed by Madalyn I. Saheb Khan, Khalid Saheb Khan in Malheur County Circuit Court, Oregon.(jld)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saheb Khan et al v. Jayco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madalyn I. Saheb Khan
Represented By: Jessica L. Molligan
Represented By: Sara Mae Douglass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khalid Saheb Khan
Represented By: Jessica L. Molligan
Represented By: Sara Mae Douglass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jayco Inc
Represented By: Trevor Q Gasper
Represented By: Vicki M. Smith
Represented By: Erin V Bolden
Represented By: Helaina L. Chinn
Represented By: Jason A. Gardner
Represented By: Brett R Hummer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Jeremiah J Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Hon. Michael P Scopelitis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?