Federated Mutual Insurance Company v. Kosciusko County, Indiana et al
Plaintiff: Federated Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Phend & Brown, Inc., Kosciusko County Highway Department and Kosciusko County, Indiana
Case Number: 3:2020cv00960
Filed: November 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2021 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Phend & Brown, Inc.. (Schultz, Thomas)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: The court orders Phend & Brown, Inc. to file disclosure statements under FRCP 7.1 within 7 days. Text-only order by Judge Damon R Leichty on 1/8/21. (dk)
January 7, 2021 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Phend & Brown, Inc..(Schultz, Thomas)
January 6, 2021 Filing 20 Answer and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Kosciusko County Highway Department, Kosciusko County, Indiana.(Hendel, Joseph)
January 6, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph M Hendel on behalf of Kosciusko County Highway Department, Kosciusko County, Indiana (Hendel, Joseph)
December 17, 2020 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Phend & Brown, Inc. c/o Daniel F. Brown on 11/25/2020, filed by Federated Mutual Insurance Company. (Curtin, Daniel)
December 17, 2020 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Kosciusko County, Indiana c/o Miner & Lemon, LP on 11/25/2020, filed by Federated Mutual Insurance Company. (Curtin, Daniel)
December 17, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Kosciusko County, Indiana c/o Kosciusko County Board of Commissioners on 11/25/2020, filed by Federated Mutual Insurance Company. (Curtin, Daniel)
December 17, 2020 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Kosciusko County Highway Department c/o Department Superintendent on 11/25/2020, filed by Federated Mutual Insurance Company. (Curtin, Daniel)
December 17, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Kosciusko County Highway Department c/o Miner & Lemon, LP on 11/23/2020, filed by Federated Mutual Insurance Company. (Curtin, Daniel)
December 2, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE by Phend & Brown, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Amended for Enlargement of Time (Schultz, Thomas)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING WIITHOUT PREJUDICE #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint . If still required, PBI may file either a notice that complies with the requirements of Local Rule 6-1(b) or a motion under Local Rule 6-1(a) that satisfies the standard for extensions set forth in Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b)(1)(A). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 12/2/2020. (bas)
December 2, 2020 Filing 11 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Kosciusko County Highway Department, Kosciusko County, Indiana ; answer due by 01/07/2021. (Stephenson, James)
December 1, 2020 Filing 10 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Kosciusko County Highway Department, Kosciusko County, Indiana. (Stephenson, James)
December 1, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by James S Stephenson on behalf of Kosciusko County Highway Department, Kosciusko County, Indiana (Stephenson, James)
November 30, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Lawrence Bucher, Jr on behalf of Phend & Brown, Inc. (Bucher, Jonathan)
November 30, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Phend & Brown, Inc.. (Schultz, Thomas)
November 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas R Schultz on behalf of Phend & Brown, Inc. (Schultz, Thomas)
November 16, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Kosciusko County Highway Department, Kosciusko County, Indiana, Phend & Brown, Inc.. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (kjp)
November 16, 2020 Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. NEW CASE. (kjp)
November 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Danny Merril Newman, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Newman, Danny)
November 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J Curtin on behalf of Federated Mutual Insurance Company (Curtin, Daniel)
November 13, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federated Mutual Insurance Company. (Curtin, Daniel)
November 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Kosciusko County Highway Department, Kosciusko County, Indiana, Phend & Brown, Inc.( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4398455.), filed by Federated Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons)(Curtin, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federated Mutual Insurance Company v. Kosciusko County, Indiana et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federated Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Danny Merril Newman, Jr
Represented By: Daniel J Curtin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phend & Brown, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas R Schultz
Represented By: Jonathan Lawrence Bucher, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kosciusko County Highway Department
Represented By: Joseph M Hendel
Represented By: James S Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kosciusko County, Indiana
Represented By: Joseph M Hendel
Represented By: James S Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?