Trahan v. Forest River, Inc.
Plaintiff: Roger J. Trahan
Defendant: Forest River, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01060
Filed: December 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Roger J. Trahan. Forest River, Inc. waiver sent on 2/9/2021, answer due 4/12/2021. (Dalton, Richard)
January 4, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Forest River, Inc.. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (mrm)
December 30, 2020 Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. **NEW CASE** (mrm)
December 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Forest River, Inc.( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4439204.), filed by Roger J. Trahan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dalton, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trahan v. Forest River, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest River, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger J. Trahan
Represented By: Richard C Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?