Jeznach v. Gulf Stream Coach, Inc.
Plaintiff: Debra E. Jeznach
Defendant: Gulf Stream Coach, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01065
Filed: December 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due 4/9/21 per Agreed Notice #4 (jld)
February 19, 2021 Filing 4 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Gulf Stream Coach, Inc. ; answer due by April 9, 2021. (Hoffer, Brian)
February 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian L Hoffer on behalf of Gulf Stream Coach, Inc. (Hoffer, Brian)
January 4, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Gulf Stream Coach, Inc.. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (rmf)
January 4, 2021 Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (NEW CASE) (rmf)
December 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Gulf Stream Coach, Inc.( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4439547.), filed by Debra E. Jeznach. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Dalton, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeznach v. Gulf Stream Coach, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Stream Coach, Inc.
Represented By: Brian L Hoffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra E. Jeznach
Represented By: Richard C Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?