Grand Design RV LLC v. THOR Industries Inc et al
Plaintiff: Grand Design RV LLC
Defendant: Jayco Inc, Keystone RV Company and THOR Industries Inc
Case Number: 3:2021cv00025
Filed: January 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Application for Attorney Kevin Patrick Wagner to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Grand Design RV, LLC. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4508022(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion re #19 MOTION to Seal [On behalf of All Defendants] filed by THOR Industries Inc. (Fountain, Ryan)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (slm)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Joint Proposed Discovery due by 3/22/2021. Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/31/2021 11:30 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 3/3/21. (slm)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION to Seal by Plaintiff Grand Design RV LLC. (Dodge, Reid)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 BRIEF in Support of #16 RULE 12(f) MOTION to Strike #11 Answer to Complaint , Inequitable Conduct Affirmative Defense (Redacted Version) filed by Grand Design RV LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R. Dodge, #2 Exhibit 1 - 15267562 File History Excerpts, #3 Exhibit 2 - 16058518 File History Excerpts)(Drown PHV, Chad)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Sealed Document re #16 RULE 12(f) MOTION to Strike #11 Answer to Complaint , Inequitable Conduct Affirmative Defense. (Drown PHV, Chad)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RULE 12(f) MOTION to Strike #11 Answer to Complaint , Inequitable Conduct Affirmative Defense by Plaintiff Grand Design RV LLC. (Drown PHV, Chad)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor Q Gasper on behalf of Jayco Inc, Keystone RV Company, THOR Industries Inc (Gasper, Trevor)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THOR Industries Inc. (Fountain, Ryan)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Keystone RV Company. (Fountain, Ryan)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jayco Inc. (Fountain, Ryan)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, for all Defendants, by THOR Industries Inc.(Fountain, Ryan)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan M Fountain on behalf of All Defendants (Fountain, Ryan)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Chad Michael Drown PHV for Grand Design RV LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 1/29/2021. (ace)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Application for Attorney Chad Michael Drown to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Grand Design RV, LLC. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4467329(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines/Hearings: per #7 Jayco Inc answer due 2/3/2021; per #6 Keystone RV Company answer due 2/2/2021; per #5 THOR Industries Inc answer due 2/2/2021. (rmc)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Jayco, Inc. on 1/13/2021, filed by Grand Design RV LLC. (Dodge, Reid)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Keystone RV Company on 1/12/2021, filed by Grand Design RV LLC. (Dodge, Reid)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Thor Industries Inc. on 1/12/2021, filed by Grand Design RV LLC. (Dodge, Reid)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Jayco Inc, Keystone RV Company, THOR Industries Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (kjp)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. NEW CASE. (kjp)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Grand Design RV LLC identifying Corporate Parent Winnebago Industries Inc for Grand Design RV LLC.. (Dodge, Reid)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Reid E Dodge on behalf of Grand Design RV LLC (Dodge, Reid)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement with JURY DEMAND against Jayco Inc, Keystone RV Company, THOR Industries Inc( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4448651.), filed by Grand Design RV LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US10046690, #2 Exhibit B - US10654398, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 AO 120 Report, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons)(Dodge, Reid) Modified docket text on 1/12/2021 (kjp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grand Design RV LLC v. THOR Industries Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jayco Inc
Represented By: Trevor Q Gasper
Represented By: Ryan M Fountain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keystone RV Company
Represented By: Trevor Q Gasper
Represented By: Ryan M Fountain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOR Industries Inc
Represented By: Trevor Q Gasper
Represented By: Ryan M Fountain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grand Design RV LLC
Represented By: Reid E Dodge
Represented By: Chad M Drown PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?