Guyer v. Wexford of Indiana
Plaintiff: Cary Guyer and Cary L Guyer, Jr
Defendant: Wexford of Indiana, Wexford of Indiana LLC, Livers and Jackson
Not Classified By Court: WESTVILLE E-FILE(Court Use Only)
Case Number: 3:2021cv00056
Filed: January 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER The court GRANTS Cary Guyer until April 5, 2021, to file an amended complaint and REMINDS Cary Guyer if he does not respond by the deadline, this case will be dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 3/19/21. (Copy mailed as directed in Order including form)(kjp)
March 18, 2021 Filing 8 Letter from Cary Guyer requesting extension of time to file Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kms)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The court GRANTS the plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis #6 ; ORDERS the plaintiff, Cary L. Guyer, Jr., IDOC # 211082, to immediately pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) $27.11 to the clerk in payment of the initial partial filing fee; ORDERS the plaintiff to pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; DIRECTS the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds; and DIRECTS the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 3/11/2021. (Copy mailed to Westville Correctional Facility)(bas)
March 11, 2021 ***Deficiency Deadline terminated. (kms)
March 11, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Cary L Guyer, Jr. (kms)
March 11, 2021 Filing 5 Consent to Receipt of Documents Through Prisoner Electronic Filing Program by Cary L Guyer, Jr. Pursuant to General Order 2018-1, documents submitted to the court for filing will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing that will constitute official service upon registered users of CM/ECF. If any parties to the case are not registered CM/ECF users, the Clerk of the Court will mail the document via U.S. Postal Service on behalf of the inmate. NOTE: The E-Filing Program does not affect the obligation of other parties to serve copies of documents in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kms)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING Cary Guyer until March 15, 2021, to resolve his filing fee status and file an amended complaint on a Pro Se 14 (INND Rev. 2/20) Prisoner Complaint form; and CAUTIONING Cary Guyer if he does not respond by the deadline, this case will be dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A without further notice. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 2/8/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(mrm)
February 5, 2021 ***Amended Pleading Deadline terminated. (kms)
February 5, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Wexford of Indiana, Jackson, Livers, filed by Cary L Guyer, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(File stamped copy sent to Guyer)(kms)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER DENYING #1 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. GRANTING Cary Guyer until 2/15/2021 to file an amended complaint on a Pro Se 14 (INND Rev. 2/20) Prisoner Complaint form; and CAUTIONING him that if he does not respond by the deadline, this case will be dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A without further notice. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 1/25/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(mrm)
January 22, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Cary Guyer. (No complaint, filing fee or IFP received) (Returned file stamped copy with case number to Guyer) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(nae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guyer v. Wexford of Indiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford of Indiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford of Indiana LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Livers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cary Guyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cary L Guyer, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: WESTVILLE E-FILE(Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?