Bohlinger v. Warden
Petitioner: Jason R Bohlinger
Respondent: Warden
Case Number: 3:2021cv00100
Filed: February 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Robert L Miller
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2021 Filing 7 Letter from Jason Bohlinger re: denied access to law library and completing appeal. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kms)
March 17, 2021 Filing 6 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 3026565 (jld)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court EXTENDS the deadline to file a notice of appeal to 4/19/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 3/15/21. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ksp)
March 11, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time by Petitioner Jason R Bohlinger. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kms)
February 18, 2021 Filing 3 CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (mrm)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 OPINION AND ORDER DISMISSING #1 Habeas Petition because it is untimely; DENYING Jason R. Bohlinger a certificate of appealability pursuant to Section 2254 Habeas Corpus Rule 11; and DIRECTING the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/17/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(mrm) Modified on 2/18/2021 to update (mrm).
February 11, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jason R Bohlinger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Letter re: filing fee payment, #3 Envelope) (No filing fee or IFP received) (Returned copy with case number to Bohlinger)(nae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bohlinger v. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jason R Bohlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?