Asemani v. The Islamic Republic of Iran Interests Section of Iran
Petitioner: Billy G Asemani
Respondent: The Islamic Republic of Iran Interests Section of Iran
Case Number: 3:2021cv00194
Filed: March 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING #9 motion which the court will construe as a notice of voluntary dismissal pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) and DIRECTING the clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 5/14/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(bas)
May 14, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION titled "Pro Se Petitioner's Substantive Response to the Court's 3/24/21 Order, and, Motion for Leave to Amend the Original Petition Under 28 U.S.C. 1963 (Petition, Case No. 3:21-MC-7-MGG), In Order to Bring It Into Full Compliance with GE Betz, Inc. v. Zee Co., Inc., 718 F.3d 615 (7th Cir. 2013)" by Billy G Asemani. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope) *Same PDF as #8 * (lhc)
May 14, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE titled "Pro Se Petitioner's Substantive Response to the Court's 3/24/21 Order, and, Motion for Leave to Amend the Original Petition Under 28 U.S.C. 1963 (Petition, Case No. 3:21-MC-7-MGG), In Order to Bring It Into Full Compliance with GE Betz, Inc. v. Zee Co., Inc., 718 F.3d 615 (7th Cir. 2013)" by Billy G Asemani to #5 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(lhc)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File regarding #5 deadline by Petitioner Billy G Asemani and ENLARGING the deadline to 6/1/2021. REMINDING Billy G. Asemani if he does not respond by the deadline, this case will be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 5/3/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lhc)
April 6, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File regarding #5 deadline by Petitioner Billy G Asemani. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (edb)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Court DIRECTS the clerk to place this cause number on a blank AO 240 (Rev. 7/10) (INND Rev. 8/16) Prisoner In Forma Pauperis Motion and send it to Billy G. Asemani, GRANTS Billy G. Asemani until April 19, 2021, to either pay $350 or seek leave to proceed in forma pauperis using that form with a copy of his inmate trust fund ledger for the prior six months, and CAUTIONS Billy G. Asemani if he does not respond by the deadline, this case will be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 03/24/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(edb)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Clerk is DIRECTED to assign Mr Asemani's Petition a civil cause number and assign an Article III District Judge to preside over that civil action consistent with established Court procedures. Upon opening of the civil action, this miscellaneous case shall be TERMINATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 3/18/21. (Copy mailed to pro se party with copy of docket sheet)(jld)
March 11, 2021 Filing 3 Letter from Billy Asemani requesting status of case (docket sheet sent) (nae) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/12/2021: #1 Restricted Copy) (nae).
March 5, 2021 Filing 2 Letter from Billy G Asemani requesting status of case. (docket sheet sent) (jld)
February 17, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION to Register a State-Court Judgment by Petitioner Billy G Asemani. ($52 filing fee paid, receipt# 3026390) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Letter to Clerk, #3 Envelope)(nae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asemani v. The Islamic Republic of Iran Interests Section of Iran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Billy G Asemani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The Islamic Republic of Iran Interests Section of Iran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?