Sanders v. University of Notre Dame
Plaintiff: Iredell Sanders
Defendant: University of Notre Dame
Case Number: 3:2021cv00404
Filed: June 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Robert L Miller
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (Copy mailed to pro se party). (smb)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/9/2021 10:00 AM Central before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due by 9/3/2021.Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 8/5/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(smb)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 8/5/2021. (cc: pro se party)(smb)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristine A Gordon on behalf of University of Notre Dame (Gordon, Kristine)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines: Answer reset to 8/25/21 per #7 Agreed Notice. (jld)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by University of Notre Dame ; answer due by August 25, 2021. (Burgan, Blake)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by University of Notre Dame. (Burgan, Blake)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Blake J Burgan on behalf of University of Notre Dame (Burgan, Blake)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to University of Notre Dame. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (cc: USMS)(bas)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The court GRANTS the plaintiff's motion to proceed without pre-payment of fees and costs #2 ; DEFERS payment of the filing fee and costs, and ORDERS the plaintiff to pay the requisite fees and costs from the proceeds of any recovery that is received in this case; and DIRECTS the United States Marshals Service to effect service of process on the defendants, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(d). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/16/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (cc: USMS)(bas)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Iredell Sanders. (kms)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against University of Notre Dame, filed by Iredell Sanders. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(kms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders v. University of Notre Dame
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iredell Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Notre Dame
Represented By: Blake J Burgan
Represented By: Kristine A Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?