Day v. Datta et al
Plaintiff: John Day
Defendant: 4NEW Ltd. and Varun Datta
Case Number: 3:2021cv00409
Filed: June 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2021 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT to #5 Order,,, Set Deadlines,, Jurisdictional Statement and Supporting Brief filed by John Day. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Memorandum of Association of 4New Limited, #3 Exhibit 2 - Cert. of Incorporation of a Private Limited Comp., #4 Exhibit 3 - Change of Registered Office Address, #5 Exhibit 4 - App. to register a company, #6 Exhibit 5 - Confirmation Statement, #7 Exhibit 6 - Notice of Ind. Person with Significant Control, #8 Exhibit 7 - Companies Act 2006, Ch. 46)(LaDue, John)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Court thus ORDERS Plaintiff John Day to file, on or before 8/4/2021, a supplemental jurisdictional statement and supporting briefing providing: (1) a statement of law regarding how Defendant 4NEW, Ltd. should be classified for purposes of determining diversity jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332 and a discussion of why that classification is correct; as well as (2) sufficient allegations as to 4NEWs citizenship(s) as outlined above. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 7/6/2021. (shk)
June 25, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John W Ross on behalf of John Day (Ross, John)
June 9, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to 4NEW Ltd., Varun Datta. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (mlc)
June 9, 2021 **NEW CASE** Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (mlc)
June 8, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John D LaDue on behalf of John Day (LaDue, John)
June 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against 4NEW Ltd., Varun Datta( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4595616.), filed by John Day. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Summons to Varun Datta, #3 Proposed Summons Summons to 4NEW)(LaDue, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Day v. Datta et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Day
Represented By: John D LaDue
Represented By: John W Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4NEW Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Varun Datta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?