Lehto et al v. Thor Motor Coach, Inc.
Plaintiff: Roy A. Lehto and Benita Lehto
Defendant: Thor Motor Coach Inc
Case Number: 3:2021cv00410
Filed: June 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Robert L Miller
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: Based upon counsel's representation that this case has been settled #35 , the court VACATES the July 29, 2021 scheduling conference and DIRECTS the parties to file their stipulation of dismissal within forty-five days. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/26/2021. (lhc)
July 21, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE of Settlement by Thor Motor Coach Inc (Bolden, Erin)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: A telephonic scheduling conference is hereby SET for 7/29/2021 at 9:00 a.m. (E.D.T). To connect to the conference, parties should dial 888-363-4749 and enter access code 6409377#. To further the goals of Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 1 and 16(b) and assist the court in preparing for the conference, the parties are ORDERED to prepare and submit a brief joint status report on or before 7/22/2021 as outlined. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/11/2021. (bas)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re #26 . Court adopts the prior case management deadlines with the following exception, ALL DISCOVERY deadline is 4/29/2022; Any amendments to the pleadings to be filed by 10/1/2021. Defendant expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the plaintiff by 4/6/2022. Plaintiff expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the defendant by 3/2/2022. Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 7/1/2021. Dispositive motions to be filed by 5/4/2022.Approved by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 6/9/21. (slm)
June 9, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin V Bolden on behalf of Thor Motor Coach Inc (Bolden, Erin)
June 9, 2021 Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Thor Motor Coach Inc identifying Corporate Parent Thor Industries, Inc. for Thor Motor Coach Inc.. (Gasper, Trevor)
June 9, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor Q Gasper on behalf of Thor Motor Coach Inc (Gasper, Trevor)
June 8, 2021 Filing 29 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Middle; Case Number 1:21-cv-00255. Original file and docket sheet received.
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER - IT is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Thors motion (Doc. 5) is GRANTED to the extent that Thor seeks a transfer to the United States District Court in Indiana. 2. The Clerk of Court shall TRANSFER this case to the United States District Court, Northern District of Indiana, South Bend Division. 3. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close this case. See Order for complete details. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 6/3/21. (dmn) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/8/2021.]
May 10, 2021 Filing 27 CIVIL PRACTICE ORDER - SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 5/10/2021. (mw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/8/2021.]
May 10, 2021 Filing 26 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - Fact Discovery due by 2/2/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 5/4/2022. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 5/10/2021. (mw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/8/2021.]
May 3, 2021 Filing 24 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN Joint by Benita Lehto, Roy A. Lehto. (Gill Roseman, Christina) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/8/2021.]
May 3, 2021 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of Corrected Certificate of Service by Benita Lehto, Roy A. Lehto re #21 Sur Reply Brief, #22 Certificate . (Gill Roseman, Christina) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/8/2021.]
May 3, 2021 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of of Service by Benita Lehto, Roy A. Lehto re #21 Sur Reply Brief . (Gill Roseman, Christina) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/8/2021.]
May 3, 2021 Filing 21 SUR REPLY to REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Benita Lehto, Roy A. Lehto.(Gill Roseman, Christina) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/8/2021.]
May 3, 2021 Filing 20 VERBAL ORDER It is ORDERED that the motion #18 for leave to file a surreply is GRANTED and plaintiffs may file a surreply on or before May 4, 2021. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 5/3/2021. (Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the order of the court or notice on the matter.) (mw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/8/2021.]
May 1, 2021 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of Revised Certificate of Concurrence by Benita Lehto, Roy A. Lehto re #18 First MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. (Gill Roseman, Christina) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/8/2021.]
April 30, 2021 Filing 18 First MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by Benita Lehto, Roy A. Lehto. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) proposed surreply, #2 Proposed Order)(Gill Roseman, Christina) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/8/2021.]
April 30, 2021 Filing 17 REPLY BRIEF re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Thor Motor Coach, Inc..(Williott, Anthony) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/8/2021.]
April 30, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Document 15 appears to be a Reply Brief and should be refiled using the correct event under Responses and Replies. (aaa) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/8/2021.]
April 29, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #15 Brief in Support by Anthony J. Williott on behalf of Thor Motor Coach, Inc. (Williott, Anthony) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/8/2021.]
April 29, 2021 Filing 15 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of Rule 12(3)(b) Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Thor Motor Coach, Inc..(Williott, Anthony) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/8/2021.]
April 16, 2021 Filing 14 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Benita Lehto, Roy A. Lehto. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Roy Lehto)(Gill Roseman, Christina) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/8/2021.]
April 16, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Document 14 (brief) deleted at the request of counsel, will be refiled. (rw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/8/2021.]
April 2, 2021 Filing 13 VERBAL ORDER It is ORDERED that the motion #12 by plaintiff is GRANTED and plaintiff shall have until April 16, 2021, to respond to defendants motion to dismiss. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 4/2/2021. (Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the order of the court or notice on the matter.) (mw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/8/2021.]
April 1, 2021 Filing 12 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss by Benita Lehto, Roy A. Lehto. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gill Roseman, Christina) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/8/2021.]
March 31, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J. Williott on behalf of Thor Motor Coach, Inc. (Williott, Anthony) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/8/2021.]
March 30, 2021 Filing 10 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Anthony J. Williott. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 3/30/2021. (mw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/8/2021.]
March 30, 2021 Filing 9 ATTACHMENT(S) Code of Professional Conduct by Thor Motor Coach, Inc. re #8 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice,, filed by Thor Motor Coach, Inc.. Related document: #8 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice, filed by Thor Motor Coach, Inc..(Williott, Anthony) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/8/2021.]
March 30, 2021 Filing 8 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Anthony J. Williott on behalf of Thor Motor Coach, Inc. Attorney Anthony Williott is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, filed by on behalf of Thor Motor Coach, Inc..(Williott, Anthony) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/8/2021.]
March 30, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file Supplement to Document 8. Signed Code of Professional Conduct needed. (aaa) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/8/2021.]
March 30, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorney and associate counsel's bar status verified. (aaa) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/8/2021.]
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 5/10/2021 at 01:30 PM before Honorable Christopher C. Conner. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 3/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Term. Calendar)(mw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/8/2021.]
March 23, 2021 Filing 6 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Thor Motor Coach, Inc..(McKeon, Kevin) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/8/2021.]
March 23, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Thor Motor Coach, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #3 Exhibit(s))(McKeon, Kevin) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/8/2021.]
March 19, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin M. McKeon on behalf of Thor Motor Coach, Inc. (McKeon, Kevin) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/8/2021.]
February 18, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: NEF's regenerated (plaintiff's attorney added incorrectly at opening; updated/corrected) (lg) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/8/2021.]
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 2/12/2021. (mw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/8/2021.]
February 11, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Thor Motor Coach, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/8/2021.]
February 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Thor Motor Coach, Inc. ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5468869), filed by Roy A. Lehto, Benita Lehto. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) 1, #3 2, #4 3, #5 4, #6 5, #7 6, #8 7)(aaa) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/8/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lehto et al v. Thor Motor Coach, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy A. Lehto
Represented By: Christina Gill Roseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benita Lehto
Represented By: Christina Gill Roseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thor Motor Coach Inc
Represented By: Anthony J. Williott
Represented By: Kevin M. McKeon
Represented By: Erin V Bolden
Represented By: Trevor Q Gasper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?