Browning v. Neal et al
Plaintiff: Tavares J Browning and Tavares Jermaine Browning
Defendant: Ron Neal, D Lott, Hasskell, Fintch and Neal
Not Classified By Court: INDIANA STATE PRISON E-FILE (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 3:2021cv00544
Filed: July 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Letter from Tavares J Browning re: Time Extension for In Forma Pauperis in civil matter. (jld)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING request for counsel #11 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 9/13/2021. (bas)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Letter from Tavares J Browning requesting appointment of counsel. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kms)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion for Enlargement of Time by Plaintiff Tavares J Browning in part and EXTENDING the deadline for him to resolve his filing fee as explained to 9/15/2021 and DENYING #9 in all other respects; DIRECTING the Clerk to place this cause number on a blank Prisoner Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis AO240 (Rev. 7/10) (INND Rev. 8/16) and send it to Tavares J. Browning; and CAUTIONING Tavares J. Browning that, if he does not respond by the deadline, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 8/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 IFP) (mrm)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Enlargement of Time by Plaintiff Tavares J Browning. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kms)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #7 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 8/10/2021. (shk)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Tavares J Browning. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kms)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DENYING #5 Letter from Tavares J Browning requesting to combine this case with case number 3:21-cv-542. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 8/6/2021. (lhc)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Letter from Tavares J Browning requesting to combine this case with case number 3:21-cv-542. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kms)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Consent to Receipt of Documents Through Prisoner Electronic Filing Program by Tavares J Browning. Pursuant to General Order 2018-1, documents submitted to the court for filing will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing that will constitute official service upon registered users of CM/ECF. If any parties to the case are not registered CM/ECF users, the Clerk of the Court will mail the document via U.S. Postal Service on behalf of the inmate. NOTE: The E-Filing Program does not affect the obligation of other parties to serve copies of documents in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (kms)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Tavares J. Browning is GRANTED until 9/2/2021 to respond to this order and CAUTIONED if he does not respond by the deadline, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 7/29/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(bas)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Fintch, Hasskell, D Lott, Neal, Ron Neal, filed by Tavares J Browning. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(No filing fee or IFP received)(File stamped copy with case number sent to Browning)(kms)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 RECEIPT of evidence to add to "Prisoner Complaint" in regards to Lt Lott, Lt. Neal, Sgt. Hasskell, Sgt. Fintch, and Warden Ron Neal, from Tavares J Browning. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Browning v. Neal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tavares J Browning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tavares Jermaine Browning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Lott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hasskell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fintch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: INDIANA STATE PRISON E-FILE (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?