Mongosa v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: MARYBETH MONGOSA
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi and Commissioner of Social Security
Not Classified By Court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 3:2021cv00642
Filed: August 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS IN A SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL CASE sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 10/12/2021. (slm)
September 24, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Trzyna - AUSA, Kathleen)
September 21, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS obo Marybeth Mongosa. Commissioner of Social Security served on 9/17/2021; U.S. Attorney General on 9/17/2021; U.S. Attorney served on 9/17/2021, answer due 11/16/2021. (bas)
September 2, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (cc: USMS)(lhc)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; WAIVING the filing fee; and DIRECTING, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(d), the United States Marshals Service to effect service of process on the defendant. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 9/1/2021. (cc: USMS) (lhc)
August 31, 2021 Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. *NEW CASE; MOTION PENDING* (lhc)
August 30, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff MARYBETH MONGOSA. (Attachments: #1 Supplement USM285, #2 Supplement USM285, #3 Supplement USM285)(Redelman, Jonelle)
August 30, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonelle L Redelman on behalf of MARYBETH MONGOSA (Redelman, Jonelle)
August 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi, filed by MARYBETH MONGOSA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Redelman, Jonelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mongosa v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARYBETH MONGOSA
Represented By: Jonelle L Redelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?