Zhiguang Yao et al v. Daimler Trucks North America LLC et al
Plaintiff: Zhiguang Yao, Suna Yao, Yongzhen Chen, Wei Chen, Yiqin Zhang, Tianyi Qiu, LIANG XU and LIANGXIU WANG
Defendant: Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Mor Ryde International, Inc., Mor Ryde Inc., Freedman Seating Company, SHIELD RESTRAINT SYSTEMS, INC., COACHWEST TRANSPORTATION INC. doing business as Coachwest Luxury and Professional Motorcars, Inc., SVO Group, Inc. and Does 2 through 50, inclusive
Case Number: 3:2021cv00784
Filed: October 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2021 Related Case Remark - The Transfer Order from the Central District of California indicates that this case is related to Case No. 3:21cv554JD-MGG. (jld)
October 14, 2021 Filing 17 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:21-cv-07496. Original file and docket sheet received.
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF INDIANA, #15 by Judge George H. Wu: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that pursuant to the stipulation of the parties who have appeared or specially-appeared in this matter, and good cause appearing therefor: This action is transferred to the Northern District of Indiana where the related action entitled Che, et al. v. Daimler Trucks North America, LLC, et al., Case No. 3:21-cv-00554-JD-MGG, is pending. Entire case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 10/14/2021.]
October 6, 2021 Filing 15 STIPULATION to Transfer Case to THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF INDIANA filed by Specially-Appearing Defendant Daimler Trucks North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cosgrove, Philip) [Transferred from California Central on 10/14/2021.] Modified on 10/15/2021 (jld).
September 29, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Nathan S. Morris on behalf of Plaintiffs Wei Chen, Yongzhen Chen, Tianyi Qiu, Liangxiu Wang, Liang Xu, Zhiguang Yao, Suna Yao, Yiqin Zhang. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case. (lt) [Transferred from California Central on 10/14/2021.]
September 29, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Jeffrey D. Eisneberg on behalf of Plaintiffs Wei Chen, Yongzhen Chen, Tianyi Qiu, Liangxiu Wang, Liang Xu, Zhiguang Yao, Suna Yao, Yiqin Zhang. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case. (lt) [Transferred from California Central on 10/14/2021.]
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 10/14/2021.]
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. (Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/1/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 11/8/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 10/14/2021.]
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cv-01296 GW(PVCx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue and Judge Dale S. Fischer to Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-07496 GW(PVCx). Signed by Judge George H. Wu (rn) [Transferred from California Central on 10/14/2021.]
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi) [Transferred from California Central on 10/14/2021.]
September 21, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Nathan S Morris. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 10/14/2021.]
September 21, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey D Eisenberg. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 10/14/2021.]
September 21, 2021 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 10/14/2021.]
September 21, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 10/14/2021.]
September 21, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 10/14/2021.]
September 20, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Coachwest Transportation Inc., Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Does 2 through 50, inclusive, Freedman Seating Company, Mor Ryde Inc., Mor Ryde International, Inc., SVO Group Inc., Shield Restraint Systems, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Liang Xu, Zhiguang Yao, Wei Chen, Suna Yao, Tianyi Qiu, Liangxiu Wang, Yiqin Zhang, Yongzhen Chen. Filed in State Court on 9/17/2021 Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal #1 (car) [Transferred from California Central on 10/14/2021.]
September 20, 2021 Filing 3 SPECIALLY-APPEARING DEFENDANT DAIMLER TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA LLCS CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Daimler Trucks North America LLC, identifying Daimler Trucks & Buses US Holding, LLC; Daimler AG. (Cosgrove, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 10/14/2021.]
September 20, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Daimler Trucks North America LLC. (Cosgrove, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 10/14/2021.]
September 20, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the State of California, Los Angeles County, case number 21STCV34426 Receipt No: ACACDC-32008868 - Fee: $402, filed by defendant Daimler Trucks North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Los Angeles County Superior Court Case) (Attorney Ryan E. Cosgrove added to party Daimler Trucks North America LLC(pty:dft))(Cosgrove, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 10/14/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zhiguang Yao et al v. Daimler Trucks North America LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zhiguang Yao
Represented By: Daniel M O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suna Yao
Represented By: Daniel M O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yongzhen Chen
Represented By: Daniel M O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wei Chen
Represented By: Daniel M O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yiqin Zhang
Represented By: Daniel M O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tianyi Qiu
Represented By: Daniel M O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LIANG XU
Represented By: Daniel M O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LIANGXIU WANG
Represented By: Daniel M O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daimler Trucks North America LLC
Represented By: Philip Russell Cosgrove
Represented By: Ryan E. Cosgrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mor Ryde International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mor Ryde Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freedman Seating Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHIELD RESTRAINT SYSTEMS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COACHWEST TRANSPORTATION INC. doing business as Coachwest Luxury and Professional Motorcars, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SVO Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 2 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?