Chroma Cars, LLC v. Harris
Plaintiff: Chroma Cars, LLC
Defendant: Amanda Harris
Case Number: 3:2021cv00825
Filed: October 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1836
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Reset Answer Deadlines: Answer for Amanda Harris due 12/27/2021 pursuant to DE #8 . (kms)
November 24, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE by Amanda Harris Notice of Extension of Time (Inabnit, Brent)
November 19, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent E Inabnit on behalf of Amanda Harris (Inabnit, Brent)
November 12, 2021 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Per #6 Amanda Harris served on 11/6/2021, answer due 11/29/2021. (rmc)
November 10, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by Chroma Cars, LLC Notice of Service of Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Declaration of Service)(Calabrese, Jeffrey)
November 1, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Amanda Harris. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (rmc)
October 28, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons filed by Chroma Cars, LLC. (Calabrese, Jeffrey)
October 27, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chroma Cars, LLC. (Calabrese, Jeffrey)
October 26, 2021 **NEW CASE** Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (nhc)
October 26, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey A Calabrese on behalf of Chroma Cars, LLC (Calabrese, Jeffrey)
October 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amanda Harris( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4727493.), filed by Chroma Cars, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Harris Agreement, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B Harris Termination Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Calabrese, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chroma Cars, LLC v. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chroma Cars, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey A Calabrese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Harris
Represented By: Brent E Inabnit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?