Carter v. Hyatte et al
Plaintiff: Curtis Carter
Defendant: Warden William Hyatte, Deputy Warden George Payne, Jr., William Hyatte and George Payne, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00847
Filed: November 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Robert L Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2021 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support of #13 MOTION for Summary Judgment regarding Exhaustion filed by William Hyatte, George Payne, Jr.. (Kirtley, William)
December 28, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment regarding Exhaustion by Defendants William Hyatte, George Payne, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Michael Gapski, #2 Exhibit Offender Grievance Process, #3 Exhibit History of Grievances)(Kirtley, William)
December 22, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by William Hyatte, George Payne, Jr..(Kirtley, William)
November 22, 2021 Reset answer deadlines for Defendants to 12/24/2021 per DE #11 . (bas)
November 22, 2021 Filing 11 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by William Hyatte, George Payne, Jr. ; answer due by December 24, 2021. (Kirtley, William)
November 22, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by George Payne, Jr., William Hyatte. (Kirtley, William)
November 22, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter A Inman on behalf of William Hyatte, George Payne, Jr. (Inman, Peter)
November 22, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by William A Kirtley on behalf of William Hyatte, George Payne, Jr. (Kirtley, William)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING 35 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and to Enter Case Management Order by Plaintiff Jeremy Blanchard, filed in 3:21cv160, pertaining to cases 3:21-cv-475, 3:21-cv-476, 3:21-cv-477, 3:21-cv-478, 3:21-cv-479, 3:21-cv-550, 3:21-cv-551, 3:21-cv-552, 3:21-cv-560, 3:21-cv-601, 3:21-cv-618, 3:21-cv-639, 3:21-cv-640, 3:21-cv-666, 3:21-cv-702, 3:21-cv-764, 3:21-cv-765, 3:21-cv-767, 3:21-cv-768, 3:21-cv-769, 3:21-cv-846, 3:21-cv-847; DIRECTING the parties to file any future pretrial, non-dispositive motions that apply to all plaintiffs in Blanchard v. Hyatte, Cause No. 3:21-cv-160, and to file any case-specific motions in the individual case or cases to which they apply; GIVING the defendants 42 days from the date of this order or their answer, whichever occurs later, as outlined in Order; If a dispositive motion on the issue of exhaustion is filed, GIVING the parties 60 days thereafter to conduct discovery relating to the exhaustion defense and to file their responses, with any reply due 14 days later. Deadlines for amendments to the pleadings, discovery, and dispositive motions unrelated to exhaustion will be set by separate order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 11/16/2021. (lhc)
November 12, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Curtis Carter. George Payne, Jr. served on 11/4/2021, answer due 11/26/2021. (Falk, Kenneth)
November 12, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Curtis Carter. William Hyatte served on 11/4/2021, answer due 11/26/2021. (Falk, Kenneth)
November 2, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to William Hyatte, George Payne, Jr. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jdb)
November 2, 2021 Related Case Remark - Counsel has indicated on the Civil Cover Sheet that this case is related to Case No. 3:21-cv-160-RLM-MGG. (jdb)
November 2, 2021 **NEW CASE** Judge Robert L Miller, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (jdb)
November 1, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Stevie J Pactor on behalf of Curtis Carter (Pactor, Stevie)
November 1, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth J Falk on behalf of Curtis Carter (Falk, Kenneth)
November 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4732185.), filed by Curtis Carter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Falk, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Hyatte et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Carter
Represented By: Stevie J Pactor
Represented By: Kenneth J Falk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden William Hyatte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Warden George Payne, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Hyatte
Represented By: Peter A Inman
Represented By: William A Kirtley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Payne, Jr.
Represented By: Peter A Inman
Represented By: William A Kirtley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?