Dodd v. Indiana Dept of Correction et al
Plaintiff: Jermaine D'Shann Dodd
Defendant: D Buss, Indiana Dept of Correction, Indiana State Prison Correctional Officers, A Allmon, Dawn Buss, Itoto and Wolff
Not Classified By Court: INDIANA STATE PRISON E-FILE (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 3:2021cv00972
Filed: December 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2022 Filing 6 Partial Initial Partial Filing fee received: $ 23.15, receipt number 3028504. (kms)
January 11, 2022 Filing 5 Consent to Receipt of Documents Through Prisoner Electronic Filing Program by Jermaine D'Shann Dodd. Pursuant to General Order 2018-1, documents submitted to the court for filing will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing that will constitute official service upon registered users of CM/ECF. If any parties to the case are not registered CM/ECF users, the Clerk of the Court will mail the document via U.S. Postal Service on behalf of the inmate. NOTE: The E-Filing Program does not affect the obligation of other parties to serve copies of documents in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (kms)
January 11, 2022 Filing 4 Partial Initial Partial Filing fee received: $ 50.00, receipt number 3028289. (kms)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; ORDERING the plaintiff, Jermaine D'Shann Dodd, IDOC # 112883, to immediately pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) $110.25 to the clerk in payment of the initial partial filing fee; ORDERING the plaintiff to pay to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; DIRECTING the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds; and DIRECTING the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 1/4/2022. (Copy mailed to pro se party and Inmate Trust Fund)(lhc)
December 29, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Jermaine D'Shann Dodd. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(kms)
December 29, 2021 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against A Allmon, D Buss, Indiana Dept of Correction, Indiana State Prison Correctional Officers, Itoto, Wolff, filed by Jermaine D'Shann Dodd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Waiver of Service of Summons)(File stamped copy with case number sent to Dodd)(kms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dodd v. Indiana Dept of Correction et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Buss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indiana Dept of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indiana State Prison Correctional Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Allmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Buss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Itoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jermaine D'Shann Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: INDIANA STATE PRISON E-FILE (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?