Jackson, Jr. v. Hyatte et al
Plaintiff: Joe E. Jackson, Jr.
Defendant: Warden William Hyatte, Deputy Warden George Payne, Jr, William Hyatte and George Payne, Jr
Case Number: 3:2022cv00001
Filed: January 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Robert L Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2022 Filing 8 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint , Demand for Jury Trial, and Statement of Affirmative Defenses by William Hyatte, George Payne, Jr.(Goldsmith, Matthew)
February 1, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE by William Hyatte, George Payne, Jr of Automatic Extension of Time (Goldsmith, Matthew)
January 24, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Erica L Sawyer on behalf of William Hyatte, George Payne, Jr (Sawyer, Erica)
January 24, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J Goldsmith on behalf of William Hyatte, George Payne, Jr (Goldsmith, Matthew)
January 4, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to William Hyatte, George Payne, Jr. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jdb)
January 4, 2022 Related Case Remark - Counsel has indicated on the Civil Cover Sheet that this case is related to Case No. 3:21-cv-160-RLM-MGG. (jdb)
January 4, 2022 **NEW CASE** Judge Robert L Miller, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (jdb)
January 3, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Stevie J Pactor on behalf of Joe E. Jackson, Jr. (Pactor, Stevie)
January 3, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth J Falk on behalf of Joe E. Jackson, Jr. (Falk, Kenneth)
January 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-4791970.), filed by Joe E. Jackson, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Falk, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson, Jr. v. Hyatte et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe E. Jackson, Jr.
Represented By: Stevie J Pactor
Represented By: Kenneth J Falk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden William Hyatte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Warden George Payne, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Hyatte
Represented By: Erica L Sawyer
Represented By: Matthew J Goldsmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Payne, Jr
Represented By: Erica L Sawyer
Represented By: Matthew J Goldsmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?