Hilligrass et al v. REV Recreation Group, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Edward Hilligrass, Susan Hillgrass, Edward E. Hilligrass and Susan Gail Hilligrass
Defendant: REV Renegade LLC, Mercedes-Benz USA LLC, REV Recreation Group, Inc and Mercedes Benz USA, LLC
Not Classified By Court: Kevin Fitzharris
Case Number: 3:2022cv00067
Filed: January 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Pursuant to De #13 the parties having consented pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c), this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr for all purposes and is reassigned pursuant to General Order 2018-2 from Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr and Judge Robert L Miller, Jr to Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr. (kms)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: On 3/3/2022, the parties timely filed their proposed report presenting an agreed discovery plan, which the Court ADOPTS by reference. The parties will exchange the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by 4/8/2022. The last date for the parties to amend the pleadings without leave of court is 4/25/2022. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from plaintiffs by 10/28/2022; and from defendants by 12/30/2022. Supplementation under Rule 26(e) due every six weeks until trial. The last date for the completion of ALL DISCOVERY is 3/31/2023. The last date to file any discovery-related nondispositive motion is 3/1/2023. The deadline to file any dispositive motions is 5/2/2023, with any response due 28 days thereafter and any reply due 14 days after the filing of a response, consistent with N.D. Ind. L.R. 56-1(b)(c). The parties have agreed upon Kevin Fitzharris as mediator. The deadline for the parties to engage in mediation is 4/17/2023. A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 3/1/2023 11:00 AM E.S.T. before the Honorable Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr. To connect to the conference, parties should dial 877-336-1828, and enter access code 5433302# at least five minutes before the conference start time. The Court hereby VACATES the Preliminary Pretrial Conference scheduled for 3/15/2022, at 11:30 a.m. E.D.T. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 3/7/2022. (asd)
March 3, 2022 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bartolotta, Ross)
February 16, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Mercedes Benz USA, LLC.(Duplechain, Bryan)
February 11, 2022 Filing 11 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (slm)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, Joint Proposed Discovery due by 3/3/2022. Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/15/2022 11:30 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 2/11/22. (slm)
February 9, 2022 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by REV Recreation Group, Inc identifying Corporate Parent REV Group, Inc., Corporate Parent REV Recreation Group Funding, Inc., Corporate Parent Renegade Holdings Corp for REV Recreation Group, Inc.. (Bartolotta, Ross)
February 9, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint , Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by REV Renegade LLC incorrectly sued as by REV Recreation Group, Inc.(Bartolotta, Ross)
January 31, 2022 Filing 7 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by REV Recreation Group, Inc ; answer due by February 14, 2022. (Bartolotta, Ross)
January 25, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by T Allon Renfro, Jr on behalf of REV Recreation Group, Inc (Renfro, T)
January 25, 2022 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mercedes Benz USA, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Daimler AG for Mercedes Benz USA, LLC.. (Duplechain, Bryan)
January 25, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan K Duplechain on behalf of Mercedes Benz USA, LLC (Duplechain, Bryan)
January 25, 2022 **NEW CASE** Judge Robert L Miller, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (nhc)
January 24, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ross W Bartolotta on behalf of REV Renegade LLC (Bartolotta, Ross)
January 24, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-4813003.) from Hillgrass v. REV Recreation Group, Inc. and Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, Cause No. 20D05-2112-PL-000285, filed by REV Renegade LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - State Court Docket)(Bartolotta, Ross)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hilligrass et al v. REV Recreation Group, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Hilligrass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Hillgrass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward E. Hilligrass
Represented By: Sara Mae Douglass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Gail Hilligrass
Represented By: Sara Mae Douglass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REV Renegade LLC
Represented By: Ross W Bartolotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REV Recreation Group, Inc
Represented By: T Allon Renfro, Jr
Represented By: Ross W Bartolotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes Benz USA, LLC
Represented By: Bryan K Duplechain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Kevin Fitzharris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?