Thor Industries, Inc. et al v. Winnebago Industries, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Thor Industries, Inc., Thor Tech, Inc. and Keystone RV Company
Defendant: Winnebago Industries, Inc. and Winnebago of Indiana, LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv00123
Filed: February 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2022 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Keystone RV Company identifying Corporate Parent Thor Industries Inc for Keystone RV Company.. (Fountain, Ryan)
April 8, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan M Fountain on behalf of Keystone RV Company (Fountain, Ryan)
April 8, 2022 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT [Responsive also to Motion to Dismiss - Docket Entry No. 9] against All Defendants, filed by Thor Tech, Inc., Keystone RV Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - U.S. Patent 7,775,543, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Voyage Fifth Wheel advertisement, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - September 28, 2021 letter to Winnebago, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 - 2006 Cougar advertisement by Keystone, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5 - Spyder Fifth Wheel advertisement, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6 - October 26, 2021 response to Ex. 3, #7 Exhibit Ex. 7 - Screen shot referred to in Parag. 23 of Amended Complaint, #8 Exhibit Ex. 8 - Screen shot referred to in Parag. 32 of Amended Complaint, #9 Exhibit Ex. 9 - Screen shot also referred to in Parag. 32 of Amended Complaint, #10 Exhibit Ex. 10 - U.S. Patent 7,500,690, #11 Supplement Amended form AOL 120)(Fountain, Ryan)
March 21, 2022 Filing 13 RECEIPT of Manual Filing of of Exhibits D and E - USB Drives - from Winnebago Industries, Inc., Winnebago of Indiana, LLC, to be stored in the South Bend Clerks office. (kms)
March 18, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING of Exhibits D and E to the Declaration of Reid E. Dodge by Winnebago Industries, Inc., Winnebago of Indiana, LLC (Dodge, Reid)
March 18, 2022 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Declaration of Reid E. Dodge filed by Winnebago Industries, Inc., Winnebago of Indiana, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Dodge, Reid)
March 18, 2022 Filing 10 BRIEF in Support of #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Winnebago of Indiana, LLC, Winnebago Industries, Inc.. (Dodge, Reid)
March 18, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants Winnebago Industries, Inc., Winnebago of Indiana, LLC. (Dodge, Reid)
March 18, 2022 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Winnebago Industries, Inc., Winnebago of Indiana, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Winnebago Industries, Inc. for Winnebago of Indiana, LLC; Other Affiliate BlackRock Inc for Winnebago Industries, Inc... (Dodge, Reid)
March 18, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Reid E Dodge on behalf of Winnebago Industries, Inc., Winnebago of Indiana, LLC (Dodge, Reid)
March 16, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thor Industries, Inc.. All Defendants served on 2/25/2022, Answer due 3/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service on Winnebago of Indiana, LLC, #2 Exhibit B - Proof of Service on Winnebago Industries, Inc., #3 Errata C- Proof of Mailing on each Defendant)(Fountain, Ryan) Modified on 3/17/2022 to add answer due date (lns).
February 16, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Winnebago Industries, Inc. and Winnebago of Indiana, LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (nal)
February 16, 2022 Copy of Form AO 120 sent to US Patent Office. (nal)
February 16, 2022 Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. NEW CASE. (nal)
February 15, 2022 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Thor Tech, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Thor Industries Inc for Thor Tech, Inc... (Fountain, Ryan)
February 15, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Thor Industries, Inc.. (Fountain, Ryan)
February 15, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan M Fountain on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Fountain, Ryan)
February 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Winnebago Industries, Inc. and Winnebago of Indiana, LLC (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINNDC-4833638) filed by Thor Industries, Inc. and Thor Tech, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 U.S. Patent 7,775,543, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 Voyage Fifth Wheel advertisement, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 Sept. 28, 2021 letter to Winnebago, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 2006 Cougar advertisement by Keystone, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5 Spyder Fifth Wheel advertisement, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6 Oct. 26, 2021 Response to Ex. 3, #7 Exhibit Ex. 7 Screen Shot referred to in Parag. 23 of Complaint, #8 Exhibit Ex. 8 Screen Shot referred to in Parag. 24 of Complaint, #9 Exhibit Ex. 9 Screen Shot also referred to in Parag. 24 of Complaint, #10 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Supplement AOL 120 - Patent Office Notice, #12 Proposed Summons Summons for Winnebago Industries, Inc., #13 Proposed Summons Summons for Winnebago of Indiana, LLC). (Fountain, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thor Industries, Inc. et al v. Winnebago Industries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thor Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan M Fountain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thor Tech, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan M Fountain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keystone RV Company
Represented By: Ryan M Fountain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winnebago Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Reid E Dodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winnebago of Indiana, LLC
Represented By: Reid E Dodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?