Richards v. Ind Dept of Corrs et al
Plaintiff: Danny R Richards
Defendant: Ind Dept of Corrs, Taylor, Hinson, Hawkins, Hadkins, Mark Newkirk, Lott and Dawn Buss
Not Classified By Court: INDIANA STATE PRISON E-FILE (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 3:2022cv00280
Filed: April 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Letter to Judge DeGuilio from Danny Richards (received without case number) (nae)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER STRIKING #6 Amended Complaint filed by Danny R Richards. GRANTING the plaintiff until 6/21/2022, to file an amended complaint containing only related claims and CAUTIONING him that if he does not respond by the deadline, this case is subject to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 5/18/2022. (mrm)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 **STRICKEN pursuant to DE #7 Order** AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hawkins, Hinson, Ind Dept of Corrs, Taylor, Mark Newkirk, Lott, Dawn Buss, filed by Danny R Richards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(kms) Modified on 5/18/2022 to strike (mrm).
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Consent to Receipt of Documents Through Prisoner Electronic Filing Program by Danny R Richards. Pursuant to General Order 2018-1, documents submitted to the court for filing will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing that will constitute official service upon registered users of CM/ECF. If any parties to the case are not registered CM/ECF users, the Clerk of the Court will mail the document via U.S. Postal Service on behalf of the inmate. NOTE: The E-Filing Program does not affect the obligation of other parties to serve copies of documents in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (kms)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Amended Pleadings Deadline terminated. (kms)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER STRIKING #1 Pro Se Complaint filed by Danny R Richards. GRANTING the plaintiff until 5/11/2022, to file an amended complaint on the appropriate form as outlined in this order and CAUTIONING him that if he does not respond by the deadline, this case is subject to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 4/11/2022. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(mrm)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. WAIVING the initial partial filing fee. ORDERING the plaintiff, Danny R. Richards, IDOC # 866216 to pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. DIRECTING the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds and DIRECTING the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 4/11/2022. (Copy mailed to pro se party and ISP Inmate Trust Fund Account)(mrm)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Danny R Richards. (kms)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 **STRICKEN pursuant to DE #4 Order** PRO SE COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Hawkins, Hinson, Ind Dept of Corrs, Taylor, filed by Danny R Richards. (File stamped copy with case number sent to Richards)(kms) Modified on 4/11/2022 to strike (mrm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richards v. Ind Dept of Corrs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny R Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ind Dept of Corrs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hadkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Newkirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Buss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: INDIANA STATE PRISON E-FILE (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?