The Evolutionary Level Above Human, Inc. v. Havel et al
Plaintiff: The Evolutionary Level Above Human, Inc. and The Evolutionary Level Above Human, Inc. doing business as The Telah Foundation
Defendant: Steven Havel, Cathy Weaver, Jason Bartel, Steven Robert Havel and Cathy JoAnn Weaver
Case Number: 3:2022cv00395
Filed: May 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2022 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, and accompanying documents served on Cathy JoAnn Weaver on 6/2/22, filed by The Evolutionary Level Above Human, Inc.. (Crum PHV, Isaac)
July 6, 2022 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, and accompanying documents served on Steven Robert Havel on 6/2/22, filed by The Evolutionary Level Above Human, Inc.. (Crum PHV, Isaac)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING Defendants Motions as to their request for an extension of time to respond to the complaint, extending the deadline to respond to 7/25/2022 (DE #14 , DE #15 ); DENYING the Defendants Motions as to their request for court-appointed counsel (DE #14 , DE #15 ); and DENYING AS MOOT the Defendants Motions as to their request to serve filings on Plaintiff via certified registered mail. (DE #14 , DE #15 ). Defendants are ADVISED that they must keep the court apprised of their current contact information and while proceeding in this action without representation, their contact information will be made public on the Courts docket. As a final matter, as of the date of this order, despite Defendants indication that they were served on June 2, 2022, the record does not reflect service upon the Defendants and no address is listed on the docket. Accordingly, the Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this order and ten copies of the complaint (DE #1 ) to Defendants last known address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 6/29/2022. (Copy mailed as directed in Order)(kmt)
June 29, 2022 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by The Evolutionary Level Above Human, Inc.. (Crum PHV, Isaac)
June 14, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION by Defendant Steven Robert Havel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(kmt)
June 14, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendant Cathy JoAnn Weaver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(kmt)
June 8, 2022 Filing 13 REPORT by The Evolutionary Level Above Human, Inc. . (Crum PHV, Isaac)
June 8, 2022 Filing 12 REPORT by The Evolutionary Level Above Human, Inc. . (Crum PHV, Isaac)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #2 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Isaac Crum PHV for The Evolutionary Level Above Human, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 5/26/2022. (ace)
May 19, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Jason Bartel, Steven Robert Havel, Cathy JoAnn Weaver. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (mlc)
May 19, 2022 **NEW CASE, MOTIONS PENDING** Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (mlc)
May 18, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Evolutionary Level Above Human, Inc.. (Crum, Isaac)
May 18, 2022 Filing 2 Application for Attorney Isaac Scott Crum to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of The Evolutionary Level Above Human, Inc. d/b/a The Telah Foundation. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number AINNDC-4921147 (Attachments: #1 Arizona State Bar Certificate of Good Standing, #2 District of Columbia Bar Certificate of Good Standing)(Crum, Isaac)
May 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-4921050.), filed by The Evolutionary Level Above Human, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Proposed Summons, #11 Proposed Summons, #12 Proposed Summons)(Crum, Isaac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Evolutionary Level Above Human, Inc. v. Havel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Evolutionary Level Above Human, Inc.
Represented By: Isaac Crum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Evolutionary Level Above Human, Inc. doing business as The Telah Foundation
Represented By: Isaac Crum PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Havel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Bartel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Robert Havel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy JoAnn Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?