Taylor v. Jayco, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Steve Taylor
Defendant: Jayco Inc, Dixie Motors LLC and Shyft Group USA The
Case Number: 3:2022cv00427
Filed: June 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2022 Filing 32 ANSWER to #26 Amended Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Jayco Inc.(Bolden, Erin)
June 8, 2022 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin V Bolden on behalf of Jayco Inc (Bolden, Erin)
June 2, 2022 Filing 30 Summons Issued as to Shyft Group USA The. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (rmf)
June 2, 2022 Filing 29 Proposed Summons filed by Steve Taylor. (Dalton, Richard)
June 1, 2022 Filing 28 Case transferred in from Central District of California. NOTE: No summons issued in transferring court or provided to transferee court for Defendant The Shyft Group USA. (jld)
June 1, 2022 Filing 27 Case transferred in from District of California Eastern; Case Number 1:21-cv-01797. Original file and docket sheet received.
May 27, 2022 Filing 26 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jayco, Inc. by Steve Taylor.(Martin-Gill, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/1/2022.] (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/1/2022: #1 First Amended Complaint) (jld). Modified on 6/1/2022 to add only the First Amended Complaint as per Order (jld).
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's #12 Motion to Change Venue and ORDER GRANTING #22 Motion to Amend the Complaint; ORDER DIRECTED to Docket the Lodged First Amended Complaint [22-2], then Transfer this case to the Northern District of Indiana, signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 05/27/2022. (Martin-Gill, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/1/2022.]
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): Due the status of this case, the Initial SCHEDULING CONFERENCE currently set for 6/2/2022 is continued to October 5, 2022, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The parties shall file a Joint Scheduling Report one week prior to the conference. The parties shall appear at the conference with each party connecting remotely either via Zoom video conference or Zoom telephone number. The parties will be provided with the Zoom ID and password by the Courtroom Deputy prior to the conference. The Zoom ID number and password are confidential and are not to be shared. Appropriate court attire required. NOTE: Motion to Change Venue (Doc. #12 ) and Motion to Amend (Doc. #22 ) pending. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/17/2022. (Valdez, E) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/1/2022.]
May 10, 2022 Filing 23 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Jayco, Inc.. (Baker, William) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/1/2022.]
April 26, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION to AMEND the #1 Complaint by Steve Taylor. Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2022 at 09:00 AM before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Dalton, Richard) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/1/2022.]
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): Due to the current status of this case, the Initial SCHEDULING CONFERENCE currently set for 3/22/2022 is continued to June 2, 2022, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The parties shall file a Joint Scheduling Report one week prior to the conference. The parties shall appear at the conference with each party connecting remotely either via Zoom video conference or Zoom telephone number. The parties will be provided with the Zoom ID and password by the Courtroom Deputy prior to the conference. The Zoom ID number and password are confidential and are not to be shared. Appropriate court attire required. NOTE: Motion to Change Venue (Doc. #12 ) pending. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/7/2022. (Valdez, E) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/1/2022.]
March 4, 2022 Filing 20 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Jayco, Inc.. (Baker, William) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/1/2022.]
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): The parties shall appear at the SCHEDULING CONFERENCE currently set for March 22, 2022, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe with each party connecting remotely either via Zoom video conference or Zoom telephone number. The parties shall be provided with the Zoom ID and password by the Courtroom Deputy prior to the conference. The Zoom ID number and password are confidential and are not to be shared. Appropriate court attire required. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/28/2022. (Valdez, E) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/1/2022.]
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) The parties are advised that pursuant to the undersigned's standing order and Local Rule 230(g), the recently filed motion to change venue #12 will be decided on the papers. No hearing will be calendared. The hearing date selected by the movant will nonetheless serve to govern the deadlines for opposition and reply briefs pursuant to Local Rule 230(c). The parties are further informed that as a result of the judicial resource emergency described in this Court's standing order re judicial emergency, more than 100 motions remain under submission in the caseload recently re-assigned to the undersigned. Although the Court has begun the process of working through this significant backlog, it may still be many months until the motion in this matter is resolved. The Court reiterates that magistrate judge consent may alleviate some of the delays caused by the resource emergency signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on February 23, 2022. (Munoz, I) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/1/2022.]
February 22, 2022 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Stephen Guidry, Jr. in support of #12 Motion to Change Venue. (Baker, William) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/1/2022.]
February 22, 2022 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Russ Draper in support of #12 Motion to Change Venue. (Baker, William) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/1/2022.]
February 22, 2022 Filing 15 DECLARATION of William Baker in support of #12 Motion to Change Venue. (Baker, William) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/1/2022.]
February 22, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE OF LODGING DOCUMENT(S) ELECTRONICALLY by Jayco, Inc.: Notice of Lodgment in support of motion to transfer venue. (Baker, William) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/1/2022.]
February 22, 2022 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM by Jayco, Inc. in SUPPORT of #12 Motion to Change Venue. (Baker, William) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/1/2022.]
February 22, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to CHANGE VENUE by Jayco, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/31/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (JLT) before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Baker, William) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/1/2022.]
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/26/2022. (Gonzalez, R) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/1/2022.]
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): On January 24, 2022, Plaintiff filed a notice of voluntary dismissal without prejudice as to Defendant Dixie Motors, L.L.C. (Doc. #9 .) light of the notice of dismissal, Defendant Dixie Motors, L.L.C. only is dismissed from this action by operation of law without further order from the Court. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate only this defendant on the docket. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/25/2022. (Valdez, E) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/1/2022.]
January 24, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Steve Taylor. (Dalton, Richard) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/1/2022.]
January 20, 2022 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Baker, William) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/1/2022.]
January 20, 2022 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Jayco, Inc.. (Baker, William) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/1/2022.]
January 20, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER by Jayco, Inc.. Attorney Baker, William Louis added.(Baker, William) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/1/2022.]
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Due to the appointment of Judge Jennifer L. Thurston to the position of U.S. District Judge, this action is reassigned from *Unassigned DJ* to District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston for all further proceedings. (Maldonado, C) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/1/2022.]
December 21, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Clarification Order, #4 Consent Form, #5 VDRP) (Marrujo, C) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/1/2022.]
December 21, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Dixie Motors, L.L.C., Jayco, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Richard Collins Dalton* *Richard C. Dalton, LLC* *P.O. Box 358* *Carencro, LA 70520*. (Marrujo, C) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/1/2022.]
December 21, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Steve Taylor. (Dalton, Richard) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/1/2022.]
December 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Steve Taylor. Attorney Dalton, Richard Collins added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9985328) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dalton, Richard) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/1/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Jayco, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Taylor
Represented By: Richard C Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jayco Inc
Represented By: William Louis Baker
Represented By: Erin V Bolden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dixie Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shyft Group USA The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?