Anderson v. Dukes Health System LLC
Plaintiff: Diane Anderson
Defendant: Dukes Health System LLC doing business as Dukes Memorial Hospital
Case Number: 3:2022cv00506
Filed: July 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Robert L Miller
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601 Family and Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2022 Filing 19 Case transferred in from District of Indiana Southern; Case Number 1:22-cv-00705. Original file and docket sheet received.
June 29, 2022 Filing 18 Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Northern District of Indiana. Case transferred electronically to Northern District of Indiana, on 6/29/2022. (AKH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/1/2022.]
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CLOSED TRANSFER to the Northern District of Indiana. (See Order). Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 6/29/2022.(AKH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/1/2022.]
June 28, 2022 Filing 16 Submission of Proposed Order , re #14 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case , filed by Defendant DUKES HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC, d/b/a DUKES MEMORIAL HOSPITAL. (Kanne, Roger) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/1/2022.]
June 27, 2022 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by DUKES HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC, d/b/a DUKES MEMORIAL HOSPITAL.(Kanne, Roger) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/1/2022.]
June 27, 2022 Filing 14 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case , filed by Defendant DUKES HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC, d/b/a DUKES MEMORIAL HOSPITAL. (Kanne, Roger) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/1/2022.]
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - granting Plaintiff's #12 Motion for Interlineation. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the Motion for Interlineation is granted, and that the caption of Plaintiff's case shall be Diane Anderson v. Dukes Health System, LLC d/b/a Dukes Memorial Hospital moving forward. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 6/8/2022. (NAD) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/1/2022.]
June 3, 2022 Filing 12 First MOTION for Interlineation, filed by Plaintiff DIANE ANDERSON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Kristina) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/1/2022.]
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/1/2022 at 10:30 AM (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 5/31/2022.(CBU) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/1/2022.]
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the deadline for Dukes Health System dba Dukes Memorial Hospital, to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby extended up to and including June 27, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 5/31/22. (NAD) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/1/2022.]
May 26, 2022 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DUKES MEMORIAL HOSPITAL AUXILIARY, INC. identifying Corporate Parent COMMUNITY HEALTH SYSTEMS, INC., Corporate Parent QHG of Clinton County Indiana for DUKES MEMORIAL HOSPITAL AUXILIARY, INC... (Kanne, Roger) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/1/2022.]
May 26, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to June 27, 2022 in which to #1 Complaint , filed by Defendant DUKES MEMORIAL HOSPITAL AUXILIARY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time In Which To Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint)(Kanne, Roger) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/1/2022.]
May 26, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Beau Browning on behalf of Defendant DUKES MEMORIAL HOSPITAL AUXILIARY, INC.. (Browning, Beau) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/1/2022.]
May 26, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Roger K. Kanne on behalf of Defendant DUKES MEMORIAL HOSPITAL AUXILIARY, INC.. (Kanne, Roger) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/1/2022.]
April 12, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristina Anderson on behalf of Plaintiff DIANE ANDERSON. (Anderson, Kristina) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/1/2022.]
April 11, 2022 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/1/2022.]
April 11, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to DUKES MEMORIAL HOSPITAL AUXILIARY, INC. (DJH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/1/2022.]
April 8, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Jane Graziano on behalf of Plaintiff Diane Anderson. (Graziano, Sarah) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/1/2022.]
April 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Diane Anderson. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-7049752) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Anderson, Kristina) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/1/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Dukes Health System LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Anderson
Represented By: Kristina J Anderson
Represented By: Sarah J Graziano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dukes Health System LLC doing business as Dukes Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Beau Browning
Represented By: Roger K Kanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?