McVoy v. IDEX Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Brett McVoy
Defendant: IDEX Corporation, Hurst Jaws of Life Inc, Macqueen Equipment, LLC d/b/a Macqueen Emergency Group and Macqueen Equipment, LLC doing business as Macqueen Emergency Group
Case Number: 3:2023cv00338
Filed: April 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2023 Filing 16 AMENDED ANSWER to COMPLAINT by Macqueen Equipment, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kearney, Kevin)
June 9, 2023 Filing 15 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (slm)
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER, Joint Proposed Discovery due by 6/29/2023. Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/25/2023 11:15 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 6/9/23. (slm)
June 5, 2023 Filing 13 ANSWER to #3 State Court Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Hurst Jaws of Life Inc, IDEX Corporation.(Hawkins, Jeffrey) Modified on 6/9/2023 to add text (mlc).
June 1, 2023 Filing 12 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Hurst Jaws of Life Inc, IDEX Corporation. (Hawkins, Jeffrey)
May 23, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kaleb Hobgood on behalf of Hurst Jaws of Life Inc, IDEX Corporation (Hobgood, Kaleb)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The Court GRANTS IDEX and Hurst's Amended Motion #9 . The deadline for IDEX and Hurst to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint is EXTENDED until 6/1/2023. Consequently, IDEX and Hursts original Motion is DENIED AS MOOT #7 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 5/19/2023. (mrm)
May 18, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 State Court Complaint by Defendants Hurst Jaws of Life Inc, IDEX Corporation. (Hawkins, Jeffrey)
May 10, 2023 Filing 8 ANSWER to #3 State Court Complaint by Macqueen Equipment, LLC.(Kearney, Kevin) Modified on 5/12/2023 to modify text (mlc).
May 4, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 State Court Complaint by Defendants Hurst Jaws of Life Inc, IDEX Corporation. (Hawkins, Jeffrey)
May 1, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Austin T Kearney on behalf of Macqueen Equipment, LLC (Kearney, Austin)
May 1, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin W Kearney on behalf of Macqueen Equipment, LLC (Kearney, Kevin)
April 28, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE by IDEX Corporation of Filing Notice of Removal with Pltf and State Court Clerk (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Filing)(Hawkins, Jeffrey)
April 28, 2023 **NEW CASE** Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (kmt)
April 27, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey D Hawkins on behalf of Hurst Jaws of Life Inc, IDEX Corporation (Hawkins, Jeffrey)
April 27, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5227780.) from St. Joseph Circuit Court, Cause No. 71C01-2303-CT-000139, filed by IDEX Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement State Court Record (Complaint, Appearance, Summons, Summons, Summons, Appearance, Mtn for EOT re Answer, Appearance, Mtn for EOT re Answer, Order Granting EOT))(Hawkins, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McVoy v. IDEX Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett McVoy
Represented By: Ryan G Milligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IDEX Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey D Hawkins
Represented By: Kaleb Hobgood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hurst Jaws of Life Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey D Hawkins
Represented By: Kaleb Hobgood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macqueen Equipment, LLC d/b/a Macqueen Emergency Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macqueen Equipment, LLC doing business as Macqueen Emergency Group
Represented By: Austin T Kearney
Represented By: Kevin W Kearney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?