Harris et al v. Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC
Plaintiff: Donna Harris, Banza Townsend and Banza P. Townsend
Defendant: Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC doing business as Praxis of South Bend
Not Classified By Court: Richard F McDevitt and SJC Coroner Patricia Jordan
Case Number: 3:2023cv00862
Filed: September 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins re #17 First Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Donna Harris. Telephonic Motion Hearing SET for 11/30/2023 at 11:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. To connect to the hearing, parties should dial 833-568-8864, enter meeting ID: 161 6325 2172#, push # to skip entry of participant ID and enter passcode 039039# at least five minutes before the hearing start time. Text entry order. (lns)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The Notice of service of disclosure #20 is STRICKEN having been filed in violation of Local Rule 26-2(a). Text entry order. (ash)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 OBJECTION by Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC to #17 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Mills, Courtney)
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE by Donna Harris of Mediator Selection (Koeneman, Gina)
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 *STRICKEN per DE 24 Order* NOTICE by Donna Harris of Service of Plaintiffs' 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Koeneman, Gina) Modified on 11/15/2023 to strike (ash).
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Quash filed by Patricia Jordan. (Agostino, Peter)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: Dft is directed to file a response to #17 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Discovery Requests by 11/16/2023. Text entry order.(mr)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Plaintiff Donna Harris. (Crossen, Trevor)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Quash filed by Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mills, Courtney)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Donna Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Crossen, Trevor)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 10/24/2023 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Plas appeared by attys Trevor Crossen and Gina Koeneman. Attys Alexis Jenkins and Courtney Mills appeared on behalf of Dft, Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC. The Court sets the following deadlines: Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 11/14/2023. Parties to file a notice with the Court by 11/14/2023 advising of their selection of a mediator. Plas expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the Dft by 5/31/2024. Dft expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the Plas by 6/28/2024. Deadline for Rule 26(e) supplements is 8/9/2024. Last date for Plas to seek leave of Court to amend the pleadings is 12/18/2023, and 2/19/2024 for Dft. Deadline to complete all discovery is 12/29/2024. Dispositive motions to be filed by 1/29/2025. Magistrate Consent forms due by 11/14/2023. Court deems 10/24/2023 as the service date of the interrogatories Dft has served on Plas. (FTR 1st floor.)(mr)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Quash by Miscellaneous Party Patricia Jordan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order of St. Joseph County Superior Court, #2 Exhibit Request for Production of Documents, #3 Exhibit Subpoena)(Agostino, Peter)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Christian J Matozzo on behalf of Patricia Jordan (Matozzo, Christian)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J Agostino on behalf of Patricia Jordan (Agostino, Peter)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Crossen, Trevor)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REPORT by Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC of Parties' Planning Meeting. (Mills, Courtney)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/24/2023 at 10:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call using telephone numbers appearing on docket. Cell phones are not permitted. (mr)
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC.(Mills, Courtney)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Related Case Remark - Counsel has indicated on the Civil Cover Sheet that this case is related to Case No. 3:23-cv-840-DRL-SLC. (nal)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. NEW CASE. (nal)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexis R Jenkins on behalf of Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC d/b/a Praxis of South Bend (Jenkins, Alexis)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney D Mills on behalf of Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC d/b/a Praxis of South Bend (Mills, Courtney)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC d/b/a Praxis of South Bend. (Mills, Courtney)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINNDC-5359268) filed by Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Mills, Courtney)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC filed in St. Joseph County Court by Donna Harris and Banza Townsend. (nal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris et al v. Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Harris
Represented By: Gina M Koeneman
Represented By: Trevor J Crossen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Banza Townsend
Represented By: Gina M Koeneman
Represented By: Trevor J Crossen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Banza P. Townsend
Represented By: Gina M Koeneman
Represented By: Trevor J Crossen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC doing business as Praxis of South Bend
Represented By: Courtney D Mills
Represented By: Alexis R Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Richard F McDevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SJC Coroner Patricia Jordan
Represented By: Peter J Agostino
Represented By: Christian J Matozzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?