Diehl et al v. Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC
Plaintiff: Suzanne Diehl, Tylor Young, April McElroy, Marcus McElroy, Sean Benner, Joseph Underwood, Kacey Whitmer, Jered Leichty, Andre Robinson, Derrick Tarver, Elliot Herron, Lewis Timothy, Drake Raines, Michael Romero, Mark White, Aaron Alexander, Mariah Patterson, Kristin Lipinski, Jordan Putz, Thomas Nelson, Nicholas Prentkowski, Walsh Poling, Zachary Cashman, Zachary Basham, Jacob Shreve, Gretchen Johnson, Travis Bates, Stephenni Endsley, Tracy Depree and Noah Williams
Defendant: Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC
Not Classified By Court: Richard F McDevitt
Case Number: 3:2023cv00863
Filed: September 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
2 Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins re #14 First Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Suzanne Diehl. Telephonic Motion Hearing SET for 11/30/2023 at 11:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. To connect to the hearing, parties should dial 833-568-8864, enter meeting ID: 161 6325 2172#, push # to skip entry of participant ID and enter passcode 039039# at least five minutes before the hearing start time. Text entry order. (lns)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The Notice of service of disclosure #16 is STRICKEN having been filed in violation of Local Rule 26-2(a). Text entry order. (ash)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 OBJECTION by Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC to #14 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Mills, Courtney)
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE by Suzanne Diehl of Mediator Selection (Koeneman, Gina)
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 *STRICKEN per DE 19 Order* NOTICE by Suzanne Diehl of Service of Plaintiffs' 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Koeneman, Gina) Modified on 11/16/2023 to strike (ash).
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: Dft is directed to file a response to #14 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Discovery Requests by 11/16/2023. Text entry order.(mr)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Plaintiff Suzanne Diehl. (Crossen, Trevor)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Suzanne Diehl. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Crossen, Trevor)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 10/24/2023 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Plas appeared by attys Trevor Crossen and Gina Koeneman. Attys Alexis Jenkins and Courtney Mills appeared on behalf of Dft, Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC. The Court sets the following deadlines: Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 11/14/2023. Parties to file a notice with the Court by 11/14/2023 advising of their selection of a mediator. Plas expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the Dft by 5/31/2024. Dft expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the Plas by 6/28/2024. Deadline for Rule 26(e) supplements is 8/9/2024. Last date for Plas to seek leave of Court to amend the pleadings is 12/18/2023, and 2/19/2024 for Dft. Deadline to complete all discovery is 12/29/2024. Dispositive motions to be filed by 1/29/2025. Magistrate Consent forms due by 11/14/2023. Court deems 10/24/2023 as the service date of the interrogatories Dft has served on Plas. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Crossen, Trevor)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REPORT by Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC of Parties' Planning Meeting. (Mills, Courtney)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/24/2023 at 10:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call using telephone numbers appearing on the docket. Cell phones are not permitted. (mr)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC.(Mills, Courtney)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The Clerk is ORDERED to reassign this case to a Magistrate Judge within the District for the purpose of conducting all non-dispositive pretrial proceedings, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and the General Orders of this Court. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 9/22/2023. (kmt)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order **NEW CASE** Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (nhc)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Related Case Remark - Counsel has indicated on the Civil Cover Sheet that this case is related to Case No. 3:23-cv-840-DRL-SLC. (nhc)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexis R Jenkins on behalf of Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC (Jenkins, Alexis)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney D Mills on behalf of Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC (Mills, Courtney)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC identifying Corporate Parent Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC for Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC.. (Mills, Courtney)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5359462.), filed by Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Mills, Courtney)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC, filed by Elliot Herron, Nicholas Prentkowski, Kacey Whitmer, Gretchen Johnson, Tylor Young, Mariah Patterson, Walsh Poling, Suzanne Diehl, Kristin Lipinski, Noah Williams, Drake Raines, Aaron Alexander, Zachary Cashman, Tracy Depree, Joseph Underwood, Jacob Shreve, Travis Bates, Stephenni Endsley, April McElroy, Andre Robinson, Lewis Timothy, Mark White, Michael Romero, Thomas Nelson, Jered Leichty, Marcus McElroy, Zachary Basham, Derrick Tarver, Jordan Putz, Sean Benner. Complaint filed in the St Joseph County Court, case number 71C01-2309-CT-000471. (nhc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diehl et al v. Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Diehl
Represented By: Gina M Koeneman
Represented By: Trevor J Crossen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tylor Young
Represented By: Gina M Koeneman
Represented By: Trevor J Crossen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April McElroy
Represented By: Gina M Koeneman
Represented By: Trevor J Crossen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus McElroy
Represented By: Gina M Koeneman
Represented By: Trevor J Crossen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Benner
Represented By: Gina M Koeneman
Represented By: Trevor J Crossen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Underwood
Represented By: Gina M Koeneman
Represented By: Trevor J Crossen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kacey Whitmer
Represented By: Gina M Koeneman
Represented By: Trevor J Crossen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jered Leichty
Represented By: Gina M Koeneman
Represented By: Trevor J Crossen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Robinson
Represented By: Gina M Koeneman
Represented By: Trevor J Crossen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Tarver
Represented By: Gina M Koeneman
Represented By: Trevor J Crossen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elliot Herron
Represented By: Gina M Koeneman
Represented By: Trevor J Crossen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lewis Timothy
Represented By: Gina M Koeneman
Represented By: Trevor J Crossen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drake Raines
Represented By: Gina M Koeneman
Represented By: Trevor J Crossen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Romero
Represented By: Gina M Koeneman
Represented By: Trevor J Crossen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark White
Represented By: Gina M Koeneman
Represented By: Trevor J Crossen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Alexander
Represented By: Gina M Koeneman
Represented By: Trevor J Crossen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariah Patterson
Represented By: Gina M Koeneman
Represented By: Trevor J Crossen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin Lipinski
Represented By: Gina M Koeneman
Represented By: Trevor J Crossen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Putz
Represented By: Gina M Koeneman
Represented By: Trevor J Crossen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Nelson
Represented By: Gina M Koeneman
Represented By: Trevor J Crossen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Prentkowski
Represented By: Gina M Koeneman
Represented By: Trevor J Crossen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walsh Poling
Represented By: Gina M Koeneman
Represented By: Trevor J Crossen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Cashman
Represented By: Gina M Koeneman
Represented By: Trevor J Crossen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Basham
Represented By: Gina M Koeneman
Represented By: Trevor J Crossen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Shreve
Represented By: Gina M Koeneman
Represented By: Trevor J Crossen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gretchen Johnson
Represented By: Gina M Koeneman
Represented By: Trevor J Crossen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Bates
Represented By: Gina M Koeneman
Represented By: Trevor J Crossen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephenni Endsley
Represented By: Gina M Koeneman
Represented By: Trevor J Crossen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Depree
Represented By: Gina M Koeneman
Represented By: Trevor J Crossen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noah Williams
Represented By: Gina M Koeneman
Represented By: Trevor J Crossen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landmark Recovery of Carmel LLC
Represented By: Alexis R Jenkins
Represented By: Courtney D Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Richard F McDevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?