Chandler v. Centurion
Plaintiff: Kyle Chandler
Defendant: Centurion
Case Number: 3:2023cv00935
Filed: October 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: John E Martin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: For reasons outlined in order, the Court DENIES #4 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/7/2023. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ash)
November 20, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Kyle Chandler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(kmt)
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; WAIVES the initial partial filing fee; ORDERS the plaintiff, Kyle Chandler, IDOC # 121735, to pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; DIRECTS the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds; and DIRECTS the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 10/26/2023. (Copy mailed as directed in Order). (nhc)
October 23, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Kyle Chandler. (kmt)
October 23, 2023 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Centurion, filed by Kyle Chandler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(File stamped copy with case number sent to Chandler)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chandler v. Centurion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centurion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?