Hunt v. Reagle et al
Plaintiff: Michael Hunt
Defendant: Christina Reagle, David Liebel, Andrew Pazera, John Galipeau and John Hicks
Not Classified By Court: PUTNAMVILLE E-FILE (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 3:2023cv01012
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: The relief requested in the notice #31 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 1/25/24. (Copy mailed to pro se party). (nhc)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Verified NOTICE Removal Civil Action from Federal Court to State Court by Michael Hunt (nae)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 RECEIPT of duplicate copy of DE #16 , #17 , #18 , #19 from Michael Hunt received via mail. (Attachments: #1 Duplicate copy of DE #17 , #2 Duplicate copy of DE #18 , #3 Duplicate copy of DE #19 )(nae)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: The court TERMINATES Mr. Hunts participation in the Prisoner Electronic Filing Program (ECF #8 ); DIRECTS the clerk to stop providing Mr. Hunt with electronic notice of returned mail in this case; and DENIES each of Mr. Hunts motions (ECF #16 ECF #17 ; ECF #19 ; and ECF #20 ). Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 1/16/2024. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(kmt)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 29 RECEIPT of duplicate copy of DE #10 received via mail (received in USPS envelope, original envelope damaged in transit) from Michael Hunt. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nae)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 RECEIPT of duplicate copy of DE #22 received via mail from Michael Hunt. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nae)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 RECEIPT of duplicate of DE #20 Motion received via mail from Michael Hunt. (nae)
January 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RECEIPT of duplicate of DE #20 Motion received via mail from Michael Hunt. (nae)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Mail Returned from Michael Hunt as REFUSED re: NEFs #15 , #16 , #17 , #18 , #19 , #20 . (nae)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Mail Returned from Michael Hunt as REFUSED by plaintiff- re: DE #14 NEF. (nae)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Verified DECLARATION in Forma Pauperis Denied by the Custodian Tricia Pretorus (Warden) (6) Month Account Print Out Due Diligence by Michael Hunt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(nae)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Verified DECLARATION for Due Diligence to Comply with the 28 Day Deadline Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(e) from the 12/11/23 Order Newly Admissible Evidence Discovered on 12/20/2023 by Michael Hunt (nae)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Verified MOTION to Strike with Sanctions for $500.00 Fine Against Danielle Whitney Statement and Exhibits Laking 28 U.S.C. 1746(2) and as Hearsay Inadmissible Fraud on Court by Plaintiff Michael Hunt. (nae)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Verified MOTION to Strike Portions of the Defendants Response Submitted to the Court as Fraud on the Court and for Sanctions Against Each Defendant $285.00 Each by Plaintiff Michael Hunt. (nae)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Verified DECLARATION in Support to #17 MOTION to Amend or Alter Judgment and Relief from Judgment with Newly Discovered Evidence Exh. J by Michael Hunt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(nae)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Verified MOTION to Amend or Alter Judgment and Relief from Judgment with Newly Discovered Evidence Exh. J by Plaintiff Michael Hunt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(nae)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Verified MOTION to Take Judicial Notice Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 10(c) et seq 12(b)(6), 79(a)(1-2)(A-C)(d) by Plaintiff Michael Hunt. (nae)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Verified DECLARATION Interested Party (Hunt) Legal Documents Filed by Electronic Means CM/ECF and by Conventional Paper on 12/27/23 by Michael Hunt (nae)
December 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Mail Returned from Michael Hunt as Refused - #7 Opinion and Order, Order Dismissing Case. (shk)
December 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Letter from Putnamville Law Library regarding Plaintiff Michael Hunt's refusal to accept legal mail. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (kmt)
December 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Mail Returned from Michael Hunt as REFUSED - Copy of #4 Duplicate copy of #1 Verified Declaration in Opposition with a MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for the Defendants Ideology, Decision, to Ban Jehovah Witness Religion Services. (kmt)
December 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Mail Returned from Michael Hunt as REFUSED - Copy of #1 Verified Declaration in Opposition with a MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for the Defendants Ideology, Decision, to Ban Jehovah Witness Religion Services. (kmt)
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Verified Declaration Interested Party Was Unable to Use the CM/ECF System in a Certificate of Service Manner Due to Human Errors by a Third Party Filer Due to Many Technical Difficulties by Michael Hunt (Attachments: #1 Designation of Evidence by Interested Party Michael Hunt for the Plaintiff's Claims Exhibits No. A, B, C, D, E, F, #2 Envelope)(nae)
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Consent to Receipt of Documents Through Prisoner Electronic Filing Program by Michael Hunt. The Prisoner Electronic Filing Program operates pursuant to General Order 2018-1. When an inmate submits a document for electronic filing, the Prison Law Library emails a scanned copy and mails the original to the Court. The inmate should not mail a paper copy to the Court or a Defendant. When the scanned copy is docketed by the Court, a Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) is emailed to the Prison Law Library. This NEF is printed by the Prison Law Library and given to the inmate with only the first page of the inmate's filing. Defendants are served by the Court. When the Prison Law Library receives an NEF for an entry by the Court, the NEF and a full copy of any attached order or document is printed and given to the inmate. The Prison Law Library will not print the NEF for documents filed by a Defendant. The Defendant must serve the inmate by mail. (nae)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (jdb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/12/2023: #1 Corrected Clerk's Judgment) (jdb).
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 OPINION AND ORDER: The request for a preliminary injunction is DENIED and this case is DISMISSED under 28 U.S.C. 1915A. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 12/10/2023. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (jdb)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The court GRANTS the plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; WAIVES the initial partial filing fee; ORDERS the plaintiff, Michael Hunt, IDOC # 961894, to pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; DIRECTS the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds; and DIRECTS the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 12/11/2023. (Copy mailed as directed in Order) (jdb)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RECEIPT of duplicate copy of DE #2 and #2 -1 from Michael Hunt received via USPS. (Attachments: #1 Duplicate copy of DE #2 -1, #2 Envelope)(kmt)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RECEIPT of duplicate copy of DE #1 and #1 -1 from Michael Hunt, received via USPS. (Attachments: #1 Duplicate copy of DE #1 -1, #2 Envelope)(kmt)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 No complaint, IFP or filing fee payment received. Returned copy of DE #1 with case number to Hunt. (nae)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Verified MOTION on Land Site Inspection for the Plaintiffs Attorneys Filed by Interested Party for Defendants Ban on Religion Services at Westville, IN Prison by Plaintiff Michael Hunt. (Attachments: #1 Designation of Evidence Interested Party for the Plaintiffs Claim)(nae)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Verified Declaration in Opposition with a MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for the Defendants Ideology, Decision, to Ban Jehovah Witness Religion Services by Plaintiff Michael Hunt. (Attachments: #1 Designation of Evidence Interested Party Exhibits for the Plaintiffs Claim)(nae)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. Magistrate Judge John E Martin and Judge Theresa L Springmann no longer assigned to case per General Order. (nae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunt v. Reagle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Reagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Liebel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Pazera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Galipeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: PUTNAMVILLE E-FILE (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?