Johnson v. Centurion Health et al
Plaintiff: Christopher M Johnson and Chris Johnson
Defendant: Centurion Health, Centurion Health of Indiana LLC, Indiana Department of Corrections, Galapo, Gann, Mental Health Provider, Jackson, Indiana State of, Westville Correctional Facility, Bridegroom and Leiaw
Not Classified By Court: WESTVILLE E-FILE(Court Use Only)
Case Number: 3:2023cv01017
Filed: November 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2023 Filing 11 Mail Returned from Christopher M Johnson as Refused - #8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (shk) **Copy of #8 Order resent to pro se pltf. Modified on 1/3/2024 to correct date filed(jld).
December 7, 2023 Filing 10 Consent to Receipt of Documents Through Prisoner Electronic Filing Program by Christopher M Johnson. The Prisoner Electronic Filing Program operates pursuant to General Order 2018-1. When an inmate submits a document for electronic filing, the Prison Law Library emails a scanned copy and mails the original to the Court. The inmate should not mail a paper copy to the Court or a Defendant. When the scanned copy is docketed by the Court, a Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) is emailed to the Prison Law Library. This NEF is printed by the Prison Law Library and given to the inmate with only the first page of the inmate's filing. Defendants are served by the Court. When the Prison Law Library receives an NEF for an entry by the Court, the NEF and a full copy of any attached order or document is printed and given to the inmate. The Prison Law Library will not print the NEF for documents filed by a Defendant. The Defendant must serve the inmate by mail. (kmt)
December 1, 2023 Filing 9 Letter from Clerk Southern District of Indiana re transfer of case. (jld)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The court GRANTS the plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis #2 ; WAIVES the initial partial filing fee; ORDERS the plaintiff, Christopher M. Johnson, IDOC # 270993, to pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; DIRECTS the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds; and DIRECTS the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Chief Judge Holly A Brady on 11/30/2023. (Copy mailed as directed in Order) (jdb)
November 29, 2023 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Indiana Southern; Case Number 1:23-cv-02110. Original file and docket sheet received. (Sent copy of docket sheet with new case number to plaintiff)
November 29, 2023 Chief Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich no longer assigned to case. (nae)
November 27, 2023 Filing 6 Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Northern District of Indiana. Case transferred electronically to Northern District of Indiana, on 11/27/2023. (CKM) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/29/2023.]
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Transferring Case to the Northern District of Indiana; Chris Johnson is a prisoner at Westville Correctional Facility in Westville, Indiana (La Porte County). He initiated this action against staff at Westville Correctional Facility seeking damages for failure to provide appropriate medical care. La Porte County sits in the Northern District of Indiana,that is the proper district for this action. The Court will transfer the case there. Accordingly, the above action is now TRANSFERRED to the South Bend Division of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Indiana. The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis dkt. #2 remains pending for review by a judge in the Northern District of Indiana. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 11/27/2023. Copy Mailed.(CKM) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/29/2023.]
November 21, 2023 Filing 4 Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (RAGS) (DJH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/29/2023.]
November 21, 2023 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/29/2023.]
November 21, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff CHRIS JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Clerk, #2 Envelope)(DJH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/29/2023.] Modified on 11/29/2023 to make motion pend (nae).
November 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BRIDGROOM, CENTURION HEALTH, GALAPO, GANN, INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, JACKSON, MENTAL HEALTH PROVIDER, STATE OF INDIANA, LEIA W., WESTVILLE CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, filed by CHRIS JOHNSON. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DJH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/29/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Centurion Health et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centurion Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centurion Health of Indiana LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indiana Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Galapo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mental Health Provider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indiana State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westville Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridegroom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leiaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher M Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: WESTVILLE E-FILE(Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?