Johnson v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Christopher M Johnson
Defendant: Elizabeth Johnson, Galipeau and Indiana Department of Corrections
Not Classified By Court: WESTVILLE E-FILE(Court Use Only)
Case Number: 3:2023cv01018
Filed: November 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 OPINION AND ORDER: The Court GRANTS Christopher M. Johnson until 2/9/2024, to file an amended complaint; and CAUTIONS Christopher M. Johnson if he does not respond by the deadline, this case will be dismissed under 28 U.S.C. 1915A without further notice because the current complaint does not state a claim for which relief can be granted. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 1/16/2024. (ash)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RECEIPT of Prisoner Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis from Christopher M Johnson. (Previously granted pursuant to DE #8 ) (kmt)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Galipeau, Indiana Department of Corrections, Elizabeth Johnson, filed by Christopher M Johnson.(kmt)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (Previously received) Consent to Receipt of Documents Through Prisoner Electronic Filing Program by Christopher M Johnson. The Prisoner Electronic Filing Program operates pursuant to General Order 2018-1. When an inmate submits a document for electronic filing, the Prison Law Library emails a scanned copy and mails the original to the Court. The inmate should not mail a paper copy to the Court or a Defendant. When the scanned copy is docketed by the Court, a Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) is emailed to the Prison Law Library. This NEF is printed by the Prison Law Library and given to the inmate with only the first page of the inmate's filing. Defendants are served by the Court. When the Prison Law Library receives an NEF for an entry by the Court, the NEF and a full copy of any attached order or document is printed and given to the inmate. The Prison Law Library will not print the NEF for documents filed by a Defendant. The Defendant must serve the inmate by mail. (kmt)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order ***Amended Pleadings Deadline terminated. (kmt)
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Mail Returned from Christopher M Johnson as Undeliverable - #9 Opinion and Order. Envelope marked Refused 12/2/2023 - Not Approved Correspondence - Enclosed Item not Allowed. (resent to Westville C.F.) (ash)
December 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Mail Returned from Christopher M Johnson as Refused - #8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (shk)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Consent to Receipt of Documents Through Prisoner Electronic Filing Program by Christopher M Johnson. The Prisoner Electronic Filing Program operates pursuant to General Order 2018-1. When an inmate submits a document for electronic filing, the Prison Law Library emails a scanned copy and mails the original to the Court. The inmate should not mail a paper copy to the Court or a Defendant. When the scanned copy is docketed by the Court, a Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) is emailed to the Prison Law Library. This NEF is printed by the Prison Law Library and given to the inmate with only the first page of the inmate's filing. Defendants are served by the Court. When the Prison Law Library receives an NEF for an entry by the Court, the NEF and a full copy of any attached order or document is printed and given to the inmate. The Prison Law Library will not print the NEF for documents filed by a Defendant. The Defendant must serve the inmate by mail. (kmt)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 OPINION AND ORDER: The Court GRANTS Christopher M. Johnson until 1/4/2024, to file an amended complaint and CAUTIONS Christopher M. Johnson if he does not respond by the deadline, this case will be dismissed under 28 U.S.C. 1915A without further notice because the current complaint does not state a claim for which relief can be granted. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 12/4/2023. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(mrm)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; WAIVES the initial partial filing fee; ORDERS the plaintiff, Christopher M. Johnson, IDOC # 270993, to pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; DIRECTS the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds; and DIRECTS the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 12/1/23. (Copy mailed to pro se party and Westville Correctional Facility as directed in Order). (nhc)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Indiana Southern; Case Number 1:23-cv-02120. Original file and docket sheet received. (copy of docket sheet with new case number sent to plaintiff)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Northern District of Indiana, South Bend Division. Case transferred electronically to Northern District of Indiana on 11/27/2023. (JSR) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/29/2023.]
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CLOSED TRANSFER to Northern District of Indiana - Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a), for the convenience of parties and witnesses, and in the interest of justice, this action is now transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Indiana, South Bend Division. (See Order.) Signed by District Judge Richard L. Young on 11/27/2023. Copy to Plaintiff via US mail. (JSR) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/29/2023.]
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (RAGS) (DJH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/29/2023.]
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/29/2023.]
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff CHRISTOPHER M. JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Resident Activity Report)(DJH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/29/2023.] Modified on 11/29/2023 to make motion pend (nae).
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GALIPEAU, INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, ELIZABETH JOHNSON, filed by CHRISTOPHER M. JOHNSON. (No fee paid with this filing) (DJH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/29/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher M Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Galipeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indiana Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: WESTVILLE E-FILE(Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?