Kirkland v. McCray et al
Plaintiff: Martize Kirkland
Defendant: Justin McCray, Centuerion Health, Chad C. Crites, Beverly A. Marshall, Margaret Keller, Michael Gapski, English, Charlene A. Burkett, T. Jiles, Ivers and Harbough
Not Classified By Court: WESTVILLE E-FILE(Court Use Only)
Case Number: 3:2023cv01033
Filed: December 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: The court DENIES the defendants' motion to join as moot #11 ; DENIES the plaintiff's motion for a change of venue #15 ; GRANTS the plaintiff's motion for an extension #16 and EXTENDS the deadline for him to file an amended complaint to 2/12/2024; and CAUTIONS him that if he does not file an amended complaint by the deadline, this case is subject to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 1/11/24. (nhc)
January 9, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION for Enlargement of Time by Plaintiff Martize Kirkland. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Envelope)(sej)
January 3, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION to Change Venue, titled as Change of Venu, by Plaintiff Martize Kirkland. (kmt)
January 3, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of Address by Martize Kirkland from Miami Correctional Facility to Westville Correctional Facility pursuant to DE #13 . (Regenerated DE #12 to Kirkland at Westville Correctional Facility) (kmt)
January 3, 2024 Filing 13 Consent to Receipt of Documents Through Prisoner Electronic Filing Program by Martize Kirkland. The Prisoner Electronic Filing Program operates pursuant to General Order 2018-1. When an inmate submits a document for electronic filing, the Prison Law Library emails a scanned copy and mails the original to the Court. The inmate should not mail a paper copy to the Court or a Defendant. When the scanned copy is docketed by the Court, a Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) is emailed to the Prison Law Library. This NEF is printed by the Prison Law Library and given to the inmate with only the first page of the inmate's filing. Defendants are served by the Court. When the Prison Law Library receives an NEF for an entry by the Court, the NEF and a full copy of any attached order or document is printed and given to the inmate. The Prison Law Library will not print the NEF for documents filed by a Defendant. The Defendant must serve the inmate by mail. (kmt)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The Court STRIKES the complaint #8 ; DENIES the defendants' motions as unnecessary #5 , #6 ; GRANTS the plaintiff until 1/3/2024, to file an amended complaint on the correct form as outlined in this order; and CAUTIONS him that if he does not respond by the deadline, this case is subject to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 12/11/2023. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ash)
December 5, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Join Co-Defendants' Motion to Screen the Complaint and Motion to Stay Responsive Pleading Deadline and/or Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading re #6 MOTION to Stay Responsive Pleading Deadline and/or for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading, #5 MOTION to Screen the Complaint by Defendants Charlene A. Burkett, English, Michael Gapski, Harbough, T. Jiles, Justin McCray. (Sawyer, Erica)
December 5, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Abigail Davis on behalf of Charlene A. Burkett, English, Michael Gapski, Harbough, T. Jiles, Justin McCray (Davis, Abigail)
December 5, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Erica L Sawyer on behalf of Charlene A. Burkett, English, Michael Gapski, Harbough, T. Jiles, Justin McCray (Sawyer, Erica)
December 4, 2023 **NEW CASE** Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (rmf)
December 1, 2023 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Centuerion Health. (Binford, Laura)
December 1, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay Responsive Pleading Deadline and/or for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Defendants Centuerion Health, Chad C. Crites, Margaret Keller, Beverly A. Marshall. (Binford, Laura)
December 1, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION to Screen the Complaint by Defendants Centuerion Health, Chad C. Crites, Margaret Keller, Beverly A. Marshall. (Binford, Laura)
December 1, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jaclyn M Flint on behalf of Centuerion Health, Chad C. Crites, Margaret Keller, Beverly A. Marshall (Flint, Jaclyn)
December 1, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura K Binford on behalf of Centuerion Health, Chad C. Crites, Margaret Keller, Beverly A. Marshall (Binford, Laura)
December 1, 2023 Filing 2 STATEMENT (Civil Cover Sheet). (Binford, Laura)
December 1, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5426823.) from Miami County Superior Court, Cause No. 52D02-2311-CT-001010, filed by Margaret Keller, Centuerion Health, Chad C. Crites, Beverly A. Marshall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Binford, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirkland v. McCray et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martize Kirkland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin McCray
Represented By: Erica L Sawyer
Represented By: Abigail Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centuerion Health
Represented By: Jaclyn M Flint
Represented By: Laura K Binford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad C. Crites
Represented By: Laura K Binford
Represented By: Jaclyn M Flint
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly A. Marshall
Represented By: Jaclyn M Flint
Represented By: Laura K Binford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Keller
Represented By: Jaclyn M Flint
Represented By: Laura K Binford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Gapski
Represented By: Abigail Davis
Represented By: Erica L Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: English
Represented By: Abigail Davis
Represented By: Erica L Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlene A. Burkett
Represented By: Abigail Davis
Represented By: Erica L Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Jiles
Represented By: Abigail Davis
Represented By: Erica L Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbough
Represented By: Abigail Davis
Represented By: Erica L Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: WESTVILLE E-FILE(Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?