Peterson v. Cabanaw et al
Plaintiff: Cameron S Peterson
Defendant: Dylan J Cabanaw and Padrick Schmitt
Not Yet Classified: INDIANA STATE PRISON E-FILE (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 3:2024cv00140
Filed: February 12, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: James T Moody
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2024 Filing 8 Letter from Robin Crabill obo Cameron Peterson regarding prison stay. (sej)
March 20, 2024 Filing 7 Letter from Robin Crabill obo Cameron Peterson regarding medical records. (Attachments: #1 Medical Records of Cameron Peterson) (sej)
March 18, 2024 Filing 6 RECEIPT of Duplicate copy of DE #4 Witness Letter titled "Statement/Affidavit" filed by (non-party) John Gustafson. (sej)
March 6, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Robin Crabill obo Cameron S Peterson from Indiana State Prison to Plainfield Correctional Facility. (Attachments: #1 Power of Attorney Documents) (E-file consent form mailed to Peterson) (sej)
February 21, 2024 Filing 4 Witness Letter titled "Statement Affidavit" filed by (non-party) John Gustafson. (sej)
February 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to close case, 1:24-cv-63 and open a new case with these filings in the South Bend Division with the same judges. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 2/13/2024. (ash)
February 12, 2024 Filing 2 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Dylan J Cabanaw, Padrick Schmitt (Filing fee paid $405.00, Receipt #FTW 1317), filed by Cameron S Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(mrm)
February 12, 2024 Filing 1 Consent to Receipt of Documents Through Prisoner Electronic Filing Program by Cameron S Peterson. The Prisoner Electronic Filing Program operates pursuant to General Order 2018-1. When an inmate submits a document for electronic filing, the Prison Law Library emails a scanned copy and mails the original to the Court. The inmate should not mail a paper copy to the Court or a Defendant. When the scanned copy is docketed by the Court, a Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) is emailed to the Prison Law Library. This NEF is printed by the Prison Law Library and given to the inmate with only the first page of the inmate's filing. Defendants are served by the Court. When the Prison Law Library receives an NEF for an entry by the Court, the NEF and a full copy of any attached order or document is printed and given to the inmate. The Prison Law Library will not print the NEF for documents filed by a Defendant. The Defendant must serve the inmate by mail. (mrm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peterson v. Cabanaw et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameron S Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dylan J Cabanaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Padrick Schmitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: INDIANA STATE PRISON E-FILE (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?