Smith v. Warden
Petitioner: Brion B Smith
Respondent: Warden
Not Yet Classified: INDIANA STATE PRISON E-FILE (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 3:2024cv00144
Filed: February 14, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Rodovich
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Pursuant to Section 2254 Habeas Corpus Rule 5, the respondent is ORDERED to enter an appearance by 04/24/2024, and to file a response to the petition with the entire administrative record by 06/11/2024. Signed by Judge Theresa L Springmann on 04/02/2024. (Copy mailed to Warden) (jdb)
April 1, 2024 ***Filing fee deadline terminated. (rmf)
March 29, 2024 Filing 4 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 2466 (rmf)
March 1, 2024 Filing 3 Consent to Receipt of Documents Through Prisoner Electronic Filing Program by Brion B Smith. The Prisoner Electronic Filing Program operates pursuant to General Order 2018-1. When an inmate submits a document for electronic filing, the Prison Law Library emails a scanned copy and mails the original to the Court. The inmate should not mail a paper copy to the Court or a Defendant. When the scanned copy is docketed by the Court, a Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) is emailed to the Prison Law Library. This NEF is printed by the Prison Law Library and given to the inmate with only the first page of the inmate's filing. Defendants are served by the Court. When the Prison Law Library receives an NEF for an entry by the Court, the NEF and a full copy of any attached order or document is printed and given to the inmate. The Prison Law Library will not print the NEF for documents filed by a Defendant. The Defendant must serve the inmate by mail. (kmt)
February 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: the court GRANTS Brion B. Smith until 3/20/2024, to resolve his filing fee status; and CAUTIONS Brion B. Smith that, if he does not respond by that deadline, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 2/21/24. (Copy mailed to pro se party). (nhc)
February 14, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Brion B Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(No filing fee or IFP received)(File stamped copy with case number sent to Smith)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brion B Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: INDIANA STATE PRISON E-FILE (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?