Newton v. Neal
Plaintiff: Larry Warren Newton, Jr
Defendant: Ron Neal
Not Yet Classified: INDIANA STATE PRISON E-FILE (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 3:2024cv00248
Filed: March 19, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; ORDERING Plaintiff, Larry Warren Newton, Jr., IDOC # 914382 to immediately pay $9.10 to the clerk in payment of the initial partial filing fee; ORDERING Plaintiff to pay to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; and DIRECTING the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds and to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 5/9/2024. (Copy mailed to Inmate Trust Fund Acct @ ISP as directed in Order)(mrm)
April 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Larry Warren Newton, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Ledger, #2 Envelope)(ash)
April 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RESPONSE by Larry Warren Newton, Jr to #2 Order. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(eeb)
April 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Consent to Receipt of Documents Through Prisoner Electronic Filing Program by Larry Warren Newton, Jr. The Prisoner Electronic Filing Program operates pursuant to General Order 2018-1. When an inmate submits a document for electronic filing, the Prison Law Library emails a scanned copy and mails the original to the Court. The inmate should not mail a paper copy to the Court or a Defendant. When the scanned copy is docketed by the Court, a Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) is emailed to the Prison Law Library. This NEF is printed by the Prison Law Library and given to the inmate with only the first page of the inmate's filing. Defendants are served by the Court. When the Prison Law Library receives an NEF for an entry by the Court, the NEF and a full copy of any attached order or document is printed and given to the inmate. The Prison Law Library will not print the NEF for documents filed by a Defendant. The Defendant must serve the inmate by mail. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (eeb)
April 17, 2024 Opinion or Order ***Deadline terminated per DE #5 . (eeb)
April 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Larry Warren Newton, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ash)
March 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: The Court GRANTS Larry Warren Newton, Jr., until 4/25/2024, to respond to this Order and CAUTIONS him that, if he does not respond by the deadline, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 3/22/2024. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ash)
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Ron Neal, filed by Larry Warren Newton, Jr. (No IFP or filing fee received) (Returned copy with case number to plaintiff)(nae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newton v. Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Warren Newton, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: INDIANA STATE PRISON E-FILE (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?