Wilburn v. Reagle et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Tyrell Wilburn and Anthony T Wilburn
Defendant: Christina Reagle, Ron Neal, David Liebel, Chaplain and Johnson
Not Yet Classified: INDIANA STATE PRISON E-FILE (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 3:2024cv00296
Filed: April 8, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Gretchen S Lund
Referring Judge: John E Martin
2 Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2024 Filing 11 CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (ash)
May 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The Court DISMISSES this case without prejudice; WAIVES the filing fee; and DIRECTS the clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Gretchen S Lund on 5/31/2024. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ash)
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The Court STRIKES the unsigned in forma pauperis motion #4 and copies of the complaint #1 & #5 , DENIES the motion for temporary restraining order and/or preliminary injunction #6 , GRANTS Anthony Tyrell Wilburn until 5/20/2024, to comply with the court's previous order #2 by filing a properly signed complaint and resolving his filing fee status, and CAUTIONS Anthony Tyrell Wilburn that if he does not do so by the deadline, this case will be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Judge Gretchen S Lund on 4/25/2024. (rmf)
April 24, 2024 Judge Gretchen S Lund added. Judge Theresa L Springmann no longer assigned to case. (nhc)
April 18, 2024 Filing 9 RECEIPT of duplicate coy of consent form from Anthony Tyrell Wilburn. (nae)
April 18, 2024 Filing 8 **Docketed in error**(unsigned) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Anthony Tyrell Wilburn. (nae) (file stamped 4/18, received by e-file 4/23) Modified on 4/25/2024 (nae).
April 18, 2024 Filing 6 (unsigned) Verified MOTION for Emergency Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction (File stamped 4/18/24, received 4/23/24 by e-file) (Attachments: #1 (unsigned) Verified Memorandum of Law in Support of Verified Motion for Emergency Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction)(nae)
April 18, 2024 Filing 5 **STRICKEN PER ORDER AT DE #7 ** RECEIPT of (unsigned) duplicate copy of DE #1 from Anthony Tyrell Wilburn. (file stamped 4/18/24, rec'd by e-file 4/23/24) (nae) Modified on 4/25/2024 to strike (rmf).
April 18, 2024 Filing 4 **STRICKEN PER ORDER AT DE #7 ** (unsigned) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Anthony Tyrell Wilburn. (nae) (file stamped 4/18/24, rec'd by e-file 4/23/24) Modified on 4/25/2024 to strike (rmf).
April 18, 2024 Filing 3 Consent to Receipt of Documents Through Prisoner Electronic Filing Program by Anthony Tyrell Wilburn. The Prisoner Electronic Filing Program operates pursuant to General Order 2018-1. When an inmate submits a document for electronic filing, the Prison Law Library emails a scanned copy and mails the original to the Court. The inmate should not mail a paper copy to the Court or a Defendant. When the scanned copy is docketed by the Court, a Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) is emailed to the Prison Law Library. This NEF is printed by the Prison Law Library and given to the inmate with only the first page of the inmate's filing. Defendants are served by the Court. When the Prison Law Library receives an NEF for an entry by the Court, the NEF and a full copy of any attached order or document is printed and given to the inmate. The Prison Law Library will not print the NEF for documents filed by a Defendant. The Defendant must serve the inmate by mail. (file stamped 4/18/24, rec'd by e-file 4/23/24) (Attachments: #1 Additional consent to e-file form) (nae)
April 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: The Court ORDERS that has until 05/20/2024, to respond to this Order. The Court CAUTIONS Wilburn that if he does not respond by the deadline, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 04/16/2024. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (jdb)
April 8, 2024 Filing 1 **STRICKEN PER ORDER AT DE #7 ** (unsigned) PRO SE COMPLAINT against Chaplain, Johnson, David Liebel, Ron Neal, Christina Reagle, filed by Anthony Tyrell Wilburn. (No IFP or filing fee received) (returned copy with case number to plaintiff)(nae) Modified on 4/25/2024 to strike (rmf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilburn v. Reagle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Tyrell Wilburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony T Wilburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Reagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Liebel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chaplain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: INDIANA STATE PRISON E-FILE (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?