Rogers v. Quality Carriers Inc et al
Plaintiff: |
Benjamin Rogers |
Defendant: |
Quality Carriers Inc, Kimberly Thietje, Zdzislaw Karpik, Dana O'Brien and B&W Cartage Company Inc |
Estate_plaintiff: |
Benjamin Rogers |
Case Number: |
4:2015cv00022 |
Filed: |
March 10, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana |
Office: |
Lafayette Office |
County: |
Hendricks |
Presiding Judge: |
Jon E DeGuilio |
Presiding Judge: |
John E Martin |
Nature of Suit: |
Motor Vehicle |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 11, 2017 |
Filing
126
OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 101 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Quality Carriers Inc, Kimberly Thietje; DENYING 105 MOTION (First) for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiff/Estate Plaintiff Benjamin Rogers; DE NYING 109 MOTION to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Nick Tumbas, Trooper Elwood, and Dr. E. Allen Griggs by Defendants Quality Carriers Inc, Kimberly Thietje; DENYING 124 MOTION (Belated) for Oral Argument by Defendants Quality Carriers Inc, Kimberly Thietje. The 101 Motion is GRANTED as to the claims of negligent infliction of emotional distress and punitive damages which are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Motion is DENIED as to causation. Signed by Judge Rudy Lozano on 7/11/17. (cer)
|
June 19, 2017 |
Filing
123
OPINION AND ORDER ADOPTING 91 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Judge Rudy Lozano on 6/19/17. (kjp)
|
June 21, 2016 |
Filing
66
OPINION AND ORDER: DENYING 46 MOTION to Strike Affidavit of James McDonald re 45 Reply to Response to Motion by Dfts; GRANTING 40 Second MOTION to Compel (renewed) by Plas. The Court ORDERS Dft Thietje to attend a deposition by Pla, as outlined i n Order. The Court further ORDERING Dfts to serve on Pla, on or before 6/27/2016, the unredacted Quality Distribution, Inc. Incident Investigation, Root Cause and Corrective Action Report in its entirety; GRANTING 55 First MOTION for Discovery Re levancy determination pursuant to 49 FMCSR 40.323 by Plas and ORDERING Dfts to serve on Plas, on or before 6/27/2016, any and all documents regarding the physical and mental condition, as outlined in Order. The Court further ORDERING Dfts to partici pate in discovery, including depositions, regarding the physical and mental condition of Dft Thietje in the time surrounding the incident. The Court ORDERING Plas to FILE, on or before 6/27/2016, an itemization of its costs and fees, including attorn ey's fees, incurred in making the Motion to Compel, with Dfts to FILE a response with the Court to Plas' request for reasonable expenses incurred in making the instant Motion on or before 7/11/2016, and Plas to file a reply, if any, by 7/18/2016. The Court DENIES as moot Plas' Request for Rulings 61 . Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 6/21/2016. (lhc)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?