Marinov v. Fiat Chrysler Automotive (FCA)
Plaintiff: Vassil Markov Marinov
Defendant: Fiat Chrysler Automotive (FCA)
Case Number: 4:2018cv00056
Filed: August 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Tippecanoe
Presiding Judge: Joseph S Van Bokkelen
Referring Judge: John E Martin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Fiat Chrysler Automotive (FCA).(Nierman, Todd)
September 10, 2018 Filing 11 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number INN 4000416. (ksp)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #9 Motion for Reconsideration and GRANTS Vassil Markov Marinov until September 13, 2018, to pay the $400 filing fee; and CAUTIONS Vassil Markov Marinov if he does not respond by the deadline, this case will be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 9/7/18. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(kjp)
September 7, 2018 ***Deadlines/Hearings terminated. Waiver of Service of Summons deadline terminated. Waiver filed 8/30/18. (tlr)
September 5, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Reconsideration re #6 Order by Plaintiff Vassil Markov Marinov. (ksp)
August 30, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Fiat Chrysler Automotive (FCA). Fiat Chrysler Automotive (FCA) waiver sent on 8/3/2018, answer due 10/2/2018. (Nierman, Todd)
August 30, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd M Nierman on behalf of Fiat Chrysler Automotive (FCA) (Nierman, Todd)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER VACATING the Order (ECF 3) granting leave to proceed in forma pauperis; DENYING Vassil Markov Marinov leave to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF 2); GRANTING Vassil Markov Marinov until 9/10/2018 to pay the $400 filing fee; and CAUTIONING him that if he does not respond by the deadline, this case will be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 8/15/18. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ksp)
August 9, 2018 Filing 5 JURY DEMAND by Plaintiff Vassil Markov Marinov. (ksp) Modified on 8/13/2018 to show jury demand/term motion per chambers(smb).
August 3, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons sent to Fiat Chrysler Automotive (FCA). (Copy mailed as directed in Order) Waiver of Service due by 9/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Complaint) (sct)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 *** VACATED PER DE #6 *** ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. DEFERS payment of the filing fee. ORDERS the plaintiff to pay the $350.00 filing fee from the proceeds of any recovery that is received in this case. DIRECTS, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(d), the clerk and the United States Marshals Service to effect service of process on the defendant. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 08/03/2018. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(sct) Modified on 8/16/2018 to edit text (ksp).
August 1, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by 1 copies of summons forms and 1 copies of USM-285 forms by Plaintiff Vassil Markov Marinov. (ksp)
August 1, 2018 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT with 1 copies of summons forms and 1 copies of USM-285 forms against Fiat Chrysler Automotive (FCA), filed by Vassil Markov Marinov. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Form 285)(ksp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marinov v. Fiat Chrysler Automotive (FCA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vassil Markov Marinov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fiat Chrysler Automotive (FCA)
Represented By: Todd M Nierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?