Estate of Dayne Young Deceased
Claimant: United States of America
Undetermined: Estate of Dayne Young, Deceased
Case Number: 4:2018cv00077
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: James T Moody
Referring Judge: Andrew P Rodovich
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/21/2018 09:30 AM in US District Court before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich is vacated re #9 Stipulation filed by United States of America. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 12/19/2018. Text entry only. cc: Edward P Dumas (tc)
December 19, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION by Claimant United States of America. (Sarnell, Bradley)
November 28, 2018 Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties (Standard Track). Magistrate Consent forms due by 12/19/2018. cc: Dumas (tc)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING: In Person Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/21/2018 09:30 AM (HMD Time) in US District Court, Hammond Division before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 11/28/2018. cc: Dumas (tc)
November 15, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Shawn D Cox on behalf of Estate of Dayne Young, Deceased (Cox, Shawn)
November 6, 2018 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED. Number of Volumes: 1; State Court Case No. 37C01-1707-ES-658. This record is maintained on paper in the court's files and is not available in electronic format. (ksp)
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 RESPONSE by United States of America to #3 State Court Complaint (To Petition for Authority to Close Estate As Insolvent). (Sarnell, Bradley)
October 24, 2018 Related Case Remark - Counsel has indicated on the Civil Cover Sheet that this case is related to Case No. 4:16CV72 TLS. (kjp)
October 24, 2018 Senior Judge James T Moody and Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich added. NEW CASE (kjp)
October 23, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley A Sarnell on behalf of United States of America (Sarnell, Bradley)
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jasper County, Indiana, Cause No. 37C01-1707-ES-000658, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A: Documents filed in State Court Action)(Sarnell, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Dayne Young Deceased
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: United States of America
Represented By: Bradley A Sarnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Estate of Dayne Young, Deceased
Represented By: Shawn D Cox
Represented By: Edward P Dumas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?