The Indiana State Council of Roofers Health and Welfare Fund Trustees of et al v. Maynard
Plaintiff: The National Roofing Industry Pension Plan Trustees of, The Roofers and Waterproofers Research and Education Joint Trust Fund Trustees of and The Indiana State Council of Roofers Health and Welfare Fund Trustees of
Defendant: Ryan Maynard
Case Number: 4:2019cv00005
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joseph S Van Bokkelen
Referring Judge: John E Martin
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *Ryan Maynard d/b/a Maynard Seamless Gutters* regarding #5 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default, filed by The Roofers and Waterproofers Research and Education Joint Trust Fund Trustees of, The National Roofing Industry Pension Plan Trustees of, The Indiana State Council of Roofers Health and Welfare Fund Trustees of. (nal)
March 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Ryan Maynard d/b/a Maynard Seamless Gutters by Plaintiffs The Indiana State Council of Roofers Health and Welfare Fund Trustees of, The National Roofing Industry Pension Plan Trustees of, The Roofers and Waterproofers Research and Education Joint Trust Fund Trustees of. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Application for Entry of Default)(Stoehr, Paul)
March 14, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Indiana State Council of Roofers Health and Welfare Fund Trustees of, The Roofers and Waterproofers Research and Education Joint Trust Fund Trustees of, The National Roofing Industry Pension Plan Trustees of. All Defendants. (Stoehr, Paul)
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ryan Maynard. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct)
January 23, 2019 Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (New Case) (sct)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul E Stoehr on behalf of Trustees of the Indiana State Council of Roofers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the National Roofing Industry Pension Plan, Trustees of the Roofers and Waterproofers Research and Education Joint Trust Fund (Stoehr, Paul)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ryan Maynard( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3788867.), filed by Trustees of the Indiana State Council of Roofers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Roofers and Waterproofers Research and Education Joint Trust Fund, Trustees of the National Roofing Industry Pension Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CBA Signature Page, #2 Exhibit B - ISCR Trust Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - NRIPP Trust Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Education Fund Trust Agreement, #5 Exhibit E - ISCR Collection Policy, #6 Exhibit F - NRIPP Collection Policy, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Proposed Summons)(Stoehr, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Indiana State Council of Roofers Health and Welfare Fund Trustees of et al v. Maynard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The National Roofing Industry Pension Plan Trustees of
Represented By: Paul E Stoehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Roofers and Waterproofers Research and Education Joint Trust Fund Trustees of
Represented By: Paul E Stoehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Indiana State Council of Roofers Health and Welfare Fund Trustees of
Represented By: Paul E Stoehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Maynard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?