Indiana State Council of Roofers Health and Welfare Fund Trustees of the v. Project Insulation LLC
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Indiana State Council of Roofers Health and Welfare Fund and Indiana State Council of Roofers Health and Welfare Fund Trustees of the
Defendant: Project Insulation LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00027
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joseph S Van Bokkelen
Referring Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Court, finding good cause shown, GRANTS #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Complaint. Plaintiff's time to serve the complaint is EXTENDED to 8/2/2019. The Court notes that N.D. Ind. L.R. 6-1(a)(2) requires that motions for extensions of time include the requested deadline. Future requests of this nature should include this information. Approved by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 6/17/2019. Text entry order. (tc)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Complaint by Plaintiff Indiana State Council of Roofers Health and Welfare Fund Trustees of the. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Attempted Service by Process Server)(Stoehr, Paul)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Project Insulation LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct)
March 21, 2019 Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. (New Case) (sct)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul E Stoehr on behalf of Trustees of the Indiana State Council of Roofers Health and Welfare Fund (Stoehr, Paul)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Project Insulation LLC( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3841254.), filed by Trustees of the Indiana State Council of Roofers Health and Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CBA, #2 Exhibit B - Trust Excerpts, #3 Exhibit C - Collection Policy, #4 Exhibit D - Audit Findings, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons)(Stoehr, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Indiana State Council of Roofers Health and Welfare Fund Trustees of the v. Project Insulation LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Indiana State Council of Roofers Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Paul E Stoehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indiana State Council of Roofers Health and Welfare Fund Trustees of the
Represented By: Paul E Stoehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Project Insulation LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?