Landis+Gyr LLC v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company etal

Plaintiff: LANDIS+GYR, LLC and Landis+Gyr LLC
Defendant: RESOLUTE MANAGEMENT INC., NATIONAL INDEMNITY COMPANY, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY and Resolute Management Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00048
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joseph S Van Bokkelen
Referring Judge: Andrew P Rodovich
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION to Remand (Reply in Support of Motion to Remand) filed by LandisGyr LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Jorczak Declaration Including Exhibit 1)(Jorczak, Robert)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: Court GRANTS #25 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6). The deadline for the Plaintiff to file its response is ENLARGED to 7/15/2019. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 7/1/2019. Text entry order. (tc)
July 1, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (UNOPPOSED) by Plaintiff LandisGyr LLC. (Jorczak, Robert)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: Court GRANTS #23 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion to Remand. Plaintiff to file its reply brief by 7/1/2019. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 6/18/2019. Text entry only. (tc)
June 18, 2019 Filing 23 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff LandisGyr LLC. (Jorczak, Robert)
June 17, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses and Request for Jury Trial by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(Shelby, Katherine)
June 17, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #17 MOTION to Remand filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, National Indemnity Company, Resolute Management Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Brian C. Bendig, #2 Exhibit 2 - Westlake Vinyls Petition)(Shelby, Katherine)
June 17, 2019 Filing 20 BRIEF in Support of #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Resolute Management Inc, National Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Hays, Michael)
June 17, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants National Indemnity Company, Resolute Management Inc. (Hays, Michael)
June 3, 2019 Filing 18 BRIEF in Support of #17 MOTION to Remand filed by LandisGyr LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: LIBERTY FORM, #2 Exhibit 2: REMAND BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY DIRECT INSURANCE, #3 Exhibit 3: RESOLUTE MGMT, #4 Exhibit 4: JORCZAK DECLARATION, #5 Exhibit 5: DISCOVERY, #6 Exhibit 6: LETTERS- NO ENCLOSURES COPY)(Huber, Brent)
June 3, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff LandisGyr LLC. (Huber, Brent)
June 3, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LandisGyr LLC identifying Corporate Parent Landis + Gyr Group AG for.. (Huber, Brent)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion and VACATING any discovery obligations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 5/31/19. (ksp)
May 29, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Discovery to Establish Deadline for Defendants' Response to Discovery Served by Plaintiff in State Court Before Removal by Defendants Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, National Indemnity Company, Resolute Management Inc. (Shelby, Katherine)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 5/16/2019. (tc)
May 14, 2019 Answers due Deadline reset for June 17, 2019 for all defendants, per DEs #8 and #9 (kjp)
May 14, 2019 Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen and Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich added. NEW CASE (kjp)
May 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J Hays on behalf of NATIONAL INDEMNITY COMPANY, RESOLUTE MANAGEMENT INC. (Hays, Michael)
May 13, 2019 Filing 10 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ; answer due by 06/17/19. (Cantrell, Dennis)
May 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis F Cantrell on behalf of LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Cantrell, Dennis)
May 13, 2019 Filing 8 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by NATIONAL INDEMNITY COMPANY, RESOLUTE MANAGEMENT INC. ; answer due by June 17 2019. (Lewis, James)
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RESOLUTE MANAGEMENT INC. identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc for RESOLUTE MANAGEMENT INC... (Lewis, James)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NATIONAL INDEMNITY COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc for NATIONAL INDEMNITY COMPANY.. (Lewis, James)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by James M Lewis on behalf of NATIONAL INDEMNITY COMPANY, RESOLUTE MANAGEMENT INC. (Lewis, James)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Shelby, Katherine)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, NATIONAL INDEMNITY COMPANY, RESOLUTE MANAGEMENT INC. to Plaintiff of Filing Notice of Removal (Shelby, Katherine)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine L Shelby on behalf of LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Shelby, Katherine)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3890047.) from Tippecanoe Circuit Court 1, Cause No. 79C01-1904-PL-000048, filed by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- List of Matters Being Filed, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Record, #3 Exhibit 3 - Resolute Management's Certificate of Good Standing from Nebraska, #4 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Suman Chakraborty, #5 Exhibit 5 - Notice of Removal to be filed with Clerk of Tippecanoe Circuit Court, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shelby, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Landis+Gyr LLC v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company etal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RESOLUTE MANAGEMENT INC.
Represented By: James M Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL INDEMNITY COMPANY
Represented By: James M Lewis
Represented By: Michael J Hays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Dennis F Cantrell
Represented By: Katherine L Shelby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resolute Management Inc
Represented By: James M Lewis
Represented By: Michael J Hays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LANDIS+GYR, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Landis+Gyr LLC
Represented By: Brent W Huber
Represented By: Robert A Jorczak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?