Indiana Farm Bureau Insurance v. Gree USA Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Indiana Farm Bureau Insurance
Defendant: Gree USA Inc. and MJC America Ltd
Case Number: 4:2019cv00067
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 21 TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 8/22/2019, before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Pla appeared by atty Nicholas Dismukes. Dfts appeared by attys John Schwarz, Harris Davidson. The Report filed as DE #20 is APPROVED and ADOPTED as follows: Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 9/30/2019. All discovery to be completed by 9/15/2020. Plaintiff expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the defendant by 5/12/2020. Defendant expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the plaintiff by 6/12/2020. Rule 26(e) supplements due by 7/30/2020. The last date any party may seek leave of court to join additional parties is 12/13/2019. Parties anticipate the case should be ready for a 5-7 day jury trial by November 2020. Mediation to be completed by 7/15/2020. Magistrate Consent forms ddl extended to 9/12/2019. All other dates/ddls to be set by presiding judge at a later time. The summary judgment deadline in FRCP 56 shall not apply. (Tape #FTR GOLD.) (tc)
August 16, 2019 Filing 20 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Dismukes, Nicholas)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER (text entry only) granting #18 Joint Motion for Telephonic Preliminary Pretrial Conference;The Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/22/2019 at 9:15 AM will be held telephonically for ALL PARTIES. Court to initiate the call. If a different number than what is listed on the docket should be used to reach counsel directly, please contact Magistrate Judge Kolar's Case Manager Teresa Castillo at (219) 852-6707 no later than 24 hours prior to the conference. Approved by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 8/14/19. (efc)
August 13, 2019 Filing 18 Joint MOTION for Telephonic Preliminary Pretrial Conference by Plaintiff Indiana Farm Bureau Insurance. (Dismukes, Nicholas)
August 8, 2019 Filing 17 Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Gree USA Inc., MJC America Ltd.(Schwarz, John)
August 7, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Indiana Farm Bureau Insurance. MJC America Ltd served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (Dismukes, Nicholas)
August 7, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Indiana Farm Bureau Insurance. Gree USA Inc. served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (Dismukes, Nicholas)
August 2, 2019 Filing 14 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 8/23/2019. (tc)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/22/2019 09:15 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 8/2/2019. (tc)
August 2, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on MJC America, Ltd. on July 15, 2019, filed by Indiana Farm Bureau Insurance. (Dismukes, Nicholas)
August 2, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Gree USA, Inc. on July 15, 2019, filed by Indiana Farm Bureau Insurance. (Dismukes, Nicholas)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Court STRIKES #8 Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand to Plaintiff's Complaint. N.D. Ind. L.R. 10-1 requires responsive pleadings to restate verbatim the paragraphs from the pleading they respond to and, immediately following each restated paragraph, to state the response to that paragraph. The Court GRANTS LEAVE for Defendants to file an answer that complies with the local rule by 8/8/2019. Approved by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 8/1/2019. Text entry order. (tc)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 8/1/2019. (tc)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 STRICKEN RE 10 ORDER: ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Gree USA Inc., MJC America Ltd.(Schwarz, John) Modified on 8/1/2019 (tc).
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 STATEMENT Plaintiff's Supplemental Jurisdictional Statement. (Dismukes, Nicholas)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiff must sufficiently allege its citizenship and the citizenship of the insured parties. Therefore, the Court ORDERS Plaintiff to FILE, on or before 7/26/2019, a supplemental jurisdictional statement that properly alleges the citizenship of the relevant parties to this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 7/12/19. (ksp)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Gree USA Inc., MJC America Ltd. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued to MJC America Ltd)(nae)
July 9, 2019 **NEW CASE** Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. (nae)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle A Cobourn-Baurley on behalf of Indiana Farm Bureau Insurance (Cobourn-Baurley, Michelle)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Indiana Farm Bureau Insurance identifying Corporate Parent Indiana Farm Bureau Inc for Indiana Farm Bureau Insurance.. (Dismukes, Nicholas)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas R Dismukes on behalf of Indiana Farm Bureau Insurance (Dismukes, Nicholas)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3943822.), filed by Indiana Farm Bureau Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Summons to Gree USA, Inc., #3 Proposed Summons Summons to MJC America, ltd.)(Dismukes, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Indiana Farm Bureau Insurance v. Gree USA Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gree USA Inc.
Represented By: John J Schwarz, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MJC America Ltd
Represented By: John J Schwarz, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indiana Farm Bureau Insurance
Represented By: Michelle A Cobourn-Baurley
Represented By: Nicholas R Dismukes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?