Jones v. Industrial Federal Credit Union et al
Plaintiff: Roma Jones
Defendant: Bobbie Shackleferd, Dana Jackson and Industrial Federal Credit Union
Not Yet Classified: Page Denise
Case Number: 4:2019cv00086
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Rodovich
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441fml
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 14 TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 10/25/2019. before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. Pla appeared by atty Jason Ramsland. Dft appeared by atty Melissa Taft, Craig Wiley. The Report filed at DE #11 is APPROVED and ADOPTED as follows: Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 12/15/2019. All discovery to be completed by 7/15/2020. Plaintiff expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the defendant by 4/15/2020. Defendant expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the plaintiff by 5/15/2020. Rule 26(e) supplements due 30 days before trial. The last date any party may join additional parties and amend the pleadings without leave of court is 1/15/2019 for the Plaintiff, and 2/15/20 for the Defendant. This case should be ready for jury trial by April 2021 to last 3 days. The parties have selected Denise Page as mediator. All other dates/ddls to be set by presiding judge at a later time. The summary judgment deadline in FRCP 56 shall not apply. (jss)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Court GRANTS #12 Motion for Leave to Participate Telephonically. The Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/25/2019 at 9:30 AM will be held telephonically for ALL PARTIES. Plaintiff to initiate the call. Approved by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 10/18/2019. Text entry only. (lr)
October 18, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically by Plaintiff Roma Jones. (Ramsland, Jason)
October 17, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Wiley, Craig)
October 7, 2019 Filing 10 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 10/28/2019. (tc)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING: In Person Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/25/2019 09:30 AM in US District Court, Hammond Division before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 10/7/2019. (tc)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses by Industrial Federal Credit Union, Dana Jackson, Bobbie Shackleferd.(Wiley, Craig)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 9/17/2019. (tc)
September 16, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due for Defendant Jackson and Shackleferd on 10/9/2019; answer due for defendant IFCU by 10/14/2019 (jld)
September 16, 2019 Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich added. (NEW CASE) (jld)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Industrial Federal Credit Union, Dana Jackson, Bobbie Shackleferd ; answer due by October 9, 2019 and October 14, 2019. (Wiley, Craig)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa K Taft on behalf of All Defendants (Taft, Melissa)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Industrial Federal Credit Union. (Wiley, Craig)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig W Wiley on behalf of All Defendants (Wiley, Craig)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4004169.) from Tippecanoe Circuit Court, Cause No. 79C01-1908-PL-000103, filed by Bobbie Shackleferd, Dana Jackson, Industrial Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Copy of Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - All Other Pleadings filed in State Court Case)(Wiley, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Industrial Federal Credit Union et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobbie Shackleferd
Represented By: Melissa K Taft
Represented By: Craig W Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Jackson
Represented By: Melissa K Taft
Represented By: Craig W Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Melissa K Taft
Represented By: Craig W Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roma Jones
Represented By: Jason R Ramsland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Page Denise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?