Gonzalez Leiva et al v. Clute et al
Plaintiff: Gabriel Garcia Arroyo, Valentin Garcia Arroyo, Kimberly Delgado, Simon Gonzalez Hernandez, Luis Lopez Carrasco, Raul Gonzalez Leyva, Jose Albino Leyva, Rogelio Corona Trejo and Enrique Gonzalez Leiva
Defendant: Keith Clute, Shawn Nower and Windy Prairie Farm LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00087
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The Motion for Entry of Judgment #14 is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. It is ORDERED that this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Joshua P. Kolar for purposes of conducting proceedings, including a damages hearing if necessary, and submitting proposed findings of fact and recommendations for the disposition of Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) and N.D. Ind. L.R. 7211(b). Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 11/6/19. (ksp)
October 9, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Windy Prairie Farm LLC, Keith Clute, and Shawn Nower by Plaintiffs Jose Albino Leyva, Rogelio Corona Trejo, Kimberly Delgado, Gabriel Garcia Arroyo, Valentin Garcia Arroyo, Simon Gonzalez Hernandez, Enrique Gonzalez Leiva, Raul Gonzalez Leyva, Luis Lopez Carrasco. (Frank, David)
October 9, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *Windy Prairie Farm LLC, Keith Clute and Shawn Nower* regarding #12 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default, filed by Valentin Garcia Arroyo, Enrique Gonzalez Leiva, Raul Gonzalez Leyva, Kimberly Delgado, Jose Albino Leyva, Rogelio Corona Trejo, Luis Lopez Carrasco, Simon Gonzalez Hernandez, Gabriel Garcia Arroyo (ksp)
October 8, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Windy Prairie Farm LLC, Keith Clute, and Shawn Nower by Plaintiffs Jose Albino Leyva, Rogelio Corona Trejo, Kimberly Delgado, Gabriel Garcia Arroyo, Valentin Garcia Arroyo, Simon Gonzalez Hernandez, Enrique Gonzalez Leiva, Raul Gonzalez Leyva, Luis Lopez Carrasco. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Proposed Entry)(Frank, David)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann for all further proceedings. Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 10/7/19. (ksc)
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Raul Gonzalez Leyva, Kimberly Delgado, Luis Lopez Carrasco, Simon Gonzalez Hernandez, Rogelio Corona Trejo, Jose Albino Leyva, Valentin Garcia Arroyo, Enrique Gonzalez Leiva, Gabriel Garcia Arroyo. Windy Prairie Farm LLC served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Return Receipt)(Hoffman, Kristin)
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Raul Gonzalez Leyva, Kimberly Delgado, Luis Lopez Carrasco, Simon Gonzalez Hernandez, Rogelio Corona Trejo, Jose Albino Leyva, Valentin Garcia Arroyo, Enrique Gonzalez Leiva, Gabriel Garcia Arroyo. Shawn Nower served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Return Receipt)(Hoffman, Kristin)
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Raul Gonzalez Leyva, Kimberly Delgado, Luis Lopez Carrasco, Simon Gonzalez Hernandez, Rogelio Corona Trejo, Jose Albino Leyva, Valentin Garcia Arroyo, Enrique Gonzalez Leiva, Gabriel Garcia Arroyo. Keith Clute served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Return Receipt)(Hoffman, Kristin)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed USM-285 form filed by Rogelio Corona Trejo, Kimberly Delgado, Gabriel Garcia Arroyo, Valentin Garcia Arroyo, Simon Gonzalez Hernandez, Enrique Gonzalez Leiva, Raul Gonzalez Leyva, Luis Lopez Carrasco. (Hoffman, Kristin) Modified on 9/13/2019 to edit text (mlc).
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed USM-285 form filed by Rogelio Corona Trejo, Kimberly Delgado, Gabriel Garcia Arroyo, Valentin Garcia Arroyo, Simon Gonzalez Hernandez, Enrique Gonzalez Leiva, Raul Gonzalez Leyva, Luis Lopez Carrasco. (Hoffman, Kristin) Modified on 9/13/2019 to edit text (mlc).
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed USM-285 filed by Rogelio Corona Trejo, Kimberly Delgado, Gabriel Garcia Arroyo, Valentin Garcia Arroyo, Simon Gonzalez Hernandez, Enrique Gonzalez Leiva, Raul Gonzalez Leyva, Luis Lopez Carrasco. (Hoffman, Kristin) Modified on 9/13/2019 to edit text (mlc).
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Keith Clute, Shawn Nower, Windy Prairie Farm LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (ksp)
September 12, 2019 Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. (NEW CASE) (ksp)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by David W Frank on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Frank, David)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin A Hoffman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hoffman, Kristin)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4004608.), filed by Raul Gonzalez Leyva, Kimberly Delgado, Luis Lopez Carrasco, Simon Gonzalez Hernandez, Rogelio Corona Trejo, Jose Albino Leyva, Valentin Garcia Arroyo, Enrique Gonzalez Leiva, Gabriel Garcia Arroyo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Job Order, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons Summons)(Hoffman, Kristin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez Leiva et al v. Clute et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Garcia Arroyo
Represented By: Kristin A Hoffman
Represented By: David W Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valentin Garcia Arroyo
Represented By: Kristin A Hoffman
Represented By: David W Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Delgado
Represented By: Kristin A Hoffman
Represented By: David W Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simon Gonzalez Hernandez
Represented By: Kristin A Hoffman
Represented By: David W Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Lopez Carrasco
Represented By: Kristin A Hoffman
Represented By: David W Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Gonzalez Leyva
Represented By: Kristin A Hoffman
Represented By: David W Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Albino Leyva
Represented By: Kristin A Hoffman
Represented By: David W Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rogelio Corona Trejo
Represented By: Kristin A Hoffman
Represented By: David W Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enrique Gonzalez Leiva
Represented By: Kristin A Hoffman
Represented By: David W Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Clute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Nower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windy Prairie Farm LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?